EP2326190 - DEVICE FOR THE PROTECTION OF COLLARS ON GARMENTS DURING WASHING OR CLEANING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zellner, Josef Aschthal 4 87654 Friesenried / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Zellner, Josef Aschthal 4 87654 Freisenried / DE | ||
Former [2011/22] | For all designated states Zellner, Josef Im Unterried 8 87665 Mauerstetten / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/22] | Representative(s) | Beck, Alexander Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Maximilianstrasse 4b 82319 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Beck, Alexander Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Maximilianstrasse 4b 82319 Starnberg / DE | ||
Former [2011/22] | Beck, Alexander Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Maximilianstrasse 4b 82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09744938.3 | 28.09.2009 | [2011/22] | WO2009DE50052 | Priority number, date | DE20082012916U | 27.09.2008 Original published format: DE 202008012916 U | [2011/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010034306 | Date: | 01.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2326190 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2326190 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A41D27/16, A41B3/18 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
A41D27/16 (EP,US);
A41B3/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/22] | A41B3/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/22] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHUTZ VON KRÄGEN AN KLEIDUNGSSTÜCKEN BEIM WASCHEN ODER REINIGEN | [2011/22] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE PROTECTION OF COLLARS ON GARMENTS DURING WASHING OR CLEANING | [2011/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION DE COLS SUR DES VÊTEMENTS LORS DU LAVAGE OU DU NETTOYAGE | [2011/22] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/22] | 10.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.09.2009 | CY | 05.09.2012 | CZ | 05.09.2012 | DK | 05.09.2012 | EE | 05.09.2012 | FI | 05.09.2012 | HR | 05.09.2012 | IT | 05.09.2012 | LT | 05.09.2012 | LV | 05.09.2012 | MK | 05.09.2012 | MT | 05.09.2012 | NL | 05.09.2012 | PL | 05.09.2012 | RO | 05.09.2012 | SE | 05.09.2012 | SI | 05.09.2012 | SK | 05.09.2012 | SM | 05.09.2012 | TR | 05.09.2012 | IE | 28.09.2012 | LU | 28.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | BG | 05.12.2012 | NO | 05.12.2012 | GR | 06.12.2012 | ES | 16.12.2012 | IS | 05.01.2013 | PT | 07.01.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 28.09.2009 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
SM | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 28.09.2012 | ||
LU | 28.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
SM | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 28.09.2012 | ||
LU | 28.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 28.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 28.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CZ | 05.09.2012 | |
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 28.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 05.09.2012 | |
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 28.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CZ | 05.09.2012 | |
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 28.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CZ | 05.09.2012 | |
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
IE | 28.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CZ | 05.09.2012 | |
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CZ | 05.09.2012 | |
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CZ | 05.09.2012 | |
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | FI | 05.09.2012 | |
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | FI | 05.09.2012 | |
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | FI | 05.09.2012 | |
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | FI | 05.09.2012 | |
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 05.09.2012 | |
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 05.09.2012 | |
NO | 05.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]CH195056 (KAISER KURT [CH]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE2556628 (DENCKLER HEINZ) [A] 1 * figures 4,5 *; | [A]US4953232 (GAINES LEE R [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]GB2401303 (UNILEVER PLC [GB])[A] 1; | [A]US7080413 (SCHNEIDER KATHERINE [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0004] *; | [A]US2008229472 (MAGGS PETER A [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0002] * |