EP2349502 - Connection assembly for releasably connecting a golf club shaft and a golf club head, corresponding golf club, and method for assembling said golf club [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/31] | RELEASABLE CONNECTION FOR GOLF CLUB HEAD AND SHAFT | ||
[2016/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2014/32] |
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states Nike International Ltd. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMAS, James c/o NIKE Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005-6453 / US | 02 /
SANDER, Raymond J. c/o NIKE Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005-6453 / US | 03 /
CONTINI, Vincent J. c/o NIKE Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005-6453 / US | 04 /
PRESCOTT, James Alan c/o NIKE Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005-6453 / US | 05 /
RUBAL, Matthew Paul c/o Battelle Memorial Institute 505 King Avenue Columbus, OH 43201-2693 / US | 06 /
TREES, Gregory A. c/o NIKE Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005-6453 / US | [2011/42] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
THOMAS, James c/o NIKE Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005-6453 / US | ||
02 /
SANDER, Raymond J. c/o NIKE Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005-6453 / US | |||
03 /
CONTINI, Vincent J. c/o NIKE Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005-6453 / US | |||
04 /
PRESCOTT, James Alan c/o NIKE Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005-6453 / US | |||
05 /
RUBAL, Matthew Paul c/o NIKE Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005-6453 / US | |||
06 /
TREES, Gregory A. c/o NIKE Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005-6453 / US | Representative(s) | Tombling, Adrian George Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/34] | Tombling, Adrian George Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2011/31] | Tombling, Adrian George Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 09745203.1 | 26.10.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009US62046 | Priority number, date | US20080269662 | 12.11.2008 Original published format: US 269662 | [2011/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010056498 | Date: | 20.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2349502 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2349502 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A63B53/02 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
A63B53/02 (EP,US);
A63B53/023 (EP,US);
A63B53/0466 (EP,US);
A63B60/00 (US);
A63B53/022 (US);
A63B53/025 (US);
A63B53/026 (US);
A63B53/047 (EP,US);
A63B53/0487 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49948 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/34] |
Former [2011/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verbindungsanordnung zur lösbaren Verbindung eines Golfschlägerkopfes und eines Golfschlägerschaftes, entsprechender Golfschläger, und Verfahren zur Montage dieses Golfschlägers | [2016/14] | English: | Connection assembly for releasably connecting a golf club shaft and a golf club head, corresponding golf club, and method for assembling said golf club | [2016/14] | French: | Ensemble de raccordement pour raccorder une tête et un manche de club de golf de façon libérable et interchangeable, club de golf correspondant, et procédé d'assemblage d'un tel club de golf | [2016/14] |
Former [2011/31] | FREIGEBBARE VERBINDUNG FÜR GOLFSCHLÄGERKOPF UND -SCHAFT | ||
Former [2011/31] | RELEASABLE CONNECTION FOR GOLF CLUB HEAD AND SHAFT | ||
Former [2011/31] | RACCORDS LIBÉRABLES POUR TÊTES ET MANCHES DE CANNE DE GOLF | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 07.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2009 | AT | 24.08.2016 | BE | 24.08.2016 | CY | 24.08.2016 | CZ | 24.08.2016 | DK | 24.08.2016 | EE | 24.08.2016 | ES | 24.08.2016 | FI | 24.08.2016 | HR | 24.08.2016 | IS | 24.08.2016 | IT | 24.08.2016 | LT | 24.08.2016 | LV | 24.08.2016 | MC | 24.08.2016 | MK | 24.08.2016 | NL | 24.08.2016 | PL | 24.08.2016 | RO | 24.08.2016 | SI | 24.08.2016 | SK | 24.08.2016 | SM | 24.08.2016 | TR | 24.08.2016 | IE | 26.10.2016 | LU | 26.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | BG | 24.11.2016 | NO | 24.11.2016 | GR | 25.11.2016 | PT | 26.12.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 26.10.2009 | |
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IS | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
TR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 26.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 26.10.2009 | |
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IS | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
TR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 26.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 26.10.2009 | |
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
TR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 26.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 26.10.2009 | |
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 26.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 26.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
LU | 26.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 24.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [IA]US4073492 (TAYLOR DAVID L) [I] 1-12,21-31,40-52 * column 2, line 36 - column 6, line 8; figures 1-12 * [A] 13,14,32,33,53,54; | [A]WO9848906 (POP PETER L [CA]) [A] 13,14,31,32,53,54* page 3, line 21 - page 6, line 5; figures 1-4 *; | [IA]US2004229712 (JACKSON GEOORGE W [CA]) [I] 1-12,21-31,40-52 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0072]; figures 9-29 * [A] 13,14,32,33,53,54; | [A]US2006229139 (JOHNSON LANNY L [US]) [A] 1,8-12,15-22,27-31,34-41,48-52,55-60 * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0125]; figures 22-25 *; | [I]US2008051211 (HOCKNELL ALAN [US], et al) [I] 1,4-12,15-23,26-31,34-41,44-52,55-60 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-7B *; | [I]US2008058114 (HOCKNELL ALAN [US], et al) [I] 1-12,15-31,34-52,55-60 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0080]; figures 6-21 * |