EP2399075 - COATED OVEN DOOR ASSEMBLY WITH SPUTTER-DEPOSITED TRANSPARENT CONDUCTIVE COATING CAPABLE OF SURVIVING HARSH ENVIRONMENTS, AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/52] | COATED ARTICLE WITH SPUTTER-DEPOSITED TRANSPARENT CONDUCTIVE COATING CAPABLE OF SURVIVING HARSH ENVIRONMENTS, AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME | ||
[2013/46] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guardian Industries Corp. 2300 Harmon Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326-1714 / US | [2011/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMSEN, Scott, V. 9017 Stoney Creek Drive South Lyon MI 48178 / US | 02 /
LAO, Jingyu 5510 Katz Farm Court Saline, MI 48716 / US | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | Hess, Peter K. G. Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | Hess, Peter K. G. Bardehle Pagenberg Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09745225.4 | 29.10.2009 | WO2009US62463 | Priority number, date | US20090379382 | 19.02.2009 Original published format: US 379382 | [2011/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010096108 | Date: | 26.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2399075 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/04, C03C17/36 | [2013/46] | CPC: |
C03C17/36 (EP,US);
C03C17/3618 (EP,US);
C03C17/3626 (EP,US);
C03C17/3644 (EP,US);
C03C17/3652 (EP,US);
C03C17/3655 (EP,US);
C03C17/3686 (EP,US);
F24C15/04 (EP,US);
C03C2217/78 (EP,US);
C03C2218/154 (EP,US);
C03C2218/365 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12542 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/52] | F24C15/04, C03C17/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETER BESTANDTEIL EINER OFENTÜR MIT EINER DURCH SPUTTERN ABGESCHIEDENEN DURCHSICHTIGEN LEITENDEN BESCHICHTUNG, DIE RAUEN UMGEBUNGEN STANDHÄLT, SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2013/46] | English: | COATED OVEN DOOR ASSEMBLY WITH SPUTTER-DEPOSITED TRANSPARENT CONDUCTIVE COATING CAPABLE OF SURVIVING HARSH ENVIRONMENTS, AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME | [2013/46] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE D'UNE PORTE DE FOUR RECOUVERT D'UN REVÊTEMENT CONDUCTEUR TRANSPARENT DÉPOSÉ PAR PULVÉRISATION POUVANT RÉSISTER À DES ENVIRONNEMENTS HOSTILES, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2014/02] |
Former [2011/52] | BESCHICHTETER ARTIKEL MIT EINER DURCH SPUTTERN ABGESCHIEDENEN DURCHSICHTIGEN LEITENDEN BESCHICHTUNG, DIE RAUEN UMGEBUNGEN STANDHÄLT, SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2011/52] | COATED ARTICLE WITH SPUTTER-DEPOSITED TRANSPARENT CONDUCTIVE COATING CAPABLE OF SURVIVING HARSH ENVIRONMENTS, AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME | ||
Former [2011/52] | ARTICLE RECOUVERT D'UN REVÊTEMENT CONDUCTEUR TRANSPARENT DÉPOSÉ PAR PULVÉRISATION POUVANT RÉSISTER À DES ENVIRONNEMENTS HOSTILES, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 18.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/45] | 20.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004253471 (THIEL JAMES P [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * paragraphs [0029] , [0032] - [0034] - [0036] , [0045] , [0052]; figures 2,5,8-10 *; | [A]WO03033427 (GUARDIAN INDUSTRIES [US]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004058169 (WANG HONG [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007029187 (KRASNOV ALEXEY [US]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document * | Examination | EP1293726 | by applicant | US6320164 | US6235343 | US6024084 | US4985312 | US4601917 | US4731256 | US4731462 | US4743506 | US4775552 | US5000790 | US5102691 | US5725904 |