EP2352813 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR PROCESSING TISSUE TO RELEASE CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxter International Inc. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, Illinois 60015-4633 / US | For all designated states Baxter Healthcare SA Thurgauerstrasse 130 8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH | [2012/28] |
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states Baxter International Inc. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, Illinois 60015-4633 / US | ||
For all designated states Baxter Healthcare SA Hertistrasse 2 Wallisellen 8304 Zurich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIN, Kyungyoon 23369 Providence Drive Kildeer, IL 60047 / US | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | Dee, Ian Mark Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | Dee, Ian Mark Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk GB-Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2011/32] | Dee, Ian Mark Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk GB-Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09745233.8 | 29.10.2009 | [2011/32] | WO2009US62584 | Priority number, date | US20080263984 | 03.11.2008 Original published format: US 263984 | US20090407946 | 20.03.2009 Original published format: US 407946 | [2011/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010062665 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2352813 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2352813 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12M3/08 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
C12M45/02 (EP,US);
C12M45/09 (EP,US);
C12M47/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/32] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE AUFARBEITUNG VON GEWEBE ZUR FREISETZUNG VON ZELLEN | [2011/32] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR PROCESSING TISSUE TO RELEASE CELLS | [2011/32] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉS POUR TRAITER UN TISSU POUR LIBÉRER DES CELLULES | [2011/32] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 22.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.10.2009 | AT | 03.10.2012 | BE | 03.10.2012 | CY | 03.10.2012 | CZ | 03.10.2012 | DK | 03.10.2012 | EE | 03.10.2012 | FI | 03.10.2012 | HR | 03.10.2012 | IT | 03.10.2012 | LT | 03.10.2012 | LV | 03.10.2012 | MK | 03.10.2012 | MT | 03.10.2012 | NL | 03.10.2012 | PL | 03.10.2012 | RO | 03.10.2012 | SI | 03.10.2012 | SK | 03.10.2012 | SM | 03.10.2012 | TR | 03.10.2012 | IE | 29.10.2012 | LU | 29.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | BG | 03.01.2013 | NO | 03.01.2013 | GR | 04.01.2013 | IS | 03.02.2013 | PT | 04.02.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 29.10.2009 | |
AT | 03.10.2012 | ||
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
SM | 03.10.2012 | ||
TR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IE | 29.10.2012 | ||
LU | 29.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
SM | 03.10.2012 | ||
TR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IE | 29.10.2012 | ||
LU | 29.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
TR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IE | 29.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
IE | 29.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
IE | 29.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
IE | 29.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 03.10.2012 | |
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 03.10.2012 | |
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 03.10.2012 | |
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 03.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0512769 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [X] 1-15 * column 4, line 34 - line 48 * * column 6, line 27 - line 56 * * column 7, line 45 - column 8, line 10 * * claims 1,2,9 * * figures 4-6 *; | [A]WO9902959 (UNIV BRISTOL [GB], et al) [A] 1-15* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0984060 (BAXTER INT [US]) [X] 1-4,6-8,11-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0018] , [0021] , [0024] , [0034] , [0035] * * figures 1,2; claims 1,4 *; | [X]DE202004010672U (BIOTEK TECHNOLOGY CORP [TW]) [X] 1-4,6-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0016] , [0017] * * figure 3 *; | [A]WO2008092697 (EPPENDORF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-55 * page 1, line 17 - line 19 * * figures 2a,2b * * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 4 * |