EP2285677 - CHILLED AIRCRAFT PASSENGER SERVICE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2011/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SÖNMEZ, Kenan Hagenbeckstrasse 160 22527 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
KERBER, Markus Lindenweg 2 23858 Reinfeld / DE | 03 /
BRAKHAN, Volker Rolandswoort 7 22763 Hamburg / DE | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/13] | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/08] | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09745546.3 | 12.05.2009 | [2011/08] | WO2009EP03370 | Priority number, date | DE20081023636 | 15.05.2008 Original published format: DE102008023636 | US20080053262 | 15.05.2008 Original published format: US 53262 | [2011/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009138212 | Date: | 19.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2285677 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2285677 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/00 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
B64D11/0007 (EP,US);
A47F3/0408 (EP,US);
B64D13/00 (EP,US);
B64D2013/0629 (EP,US);
Y02T50/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/08] | Title | German: | GEKÜHLTE FLUGZEUGPASSAGIER-SERVICEEINRICHTUNG | [2011/08] | English: | CHILLED AIRCRAFT PASSENGER SERVICE DEVICE | [2011/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF RÉFRIGÉRÉ POUR LE SERVICE DE PASSAGERS D'UN AVION | [2011/08] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 09.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.05.2009 | CY | 27.03.2013 | CZ | 27.03.2013 | DK | 27.03.2013 | EE | 27.03.2013 | FI | 27.03.2013 | HR | 27.03.2013 | IT | 27.03.2013 | LT | 27.03.2013 | LV | 27.03.2013 | MC | 27.03.2013 | MK | 27.03.2013 | MT | 27.03.2013 | NL | 27.03.2013 | PL | 27.03.2013 | RO | 27.03.2013 | SE | 27.03.2013 | SI | 27.03.2013 | SK | 27.03.2013 | TR | 27.03.2013 | IE | 12.05.2013 | LU | 12.05.2013 | BE | 31.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | BG | 27.06.2013 | NO | 27.06.2013 | GR | 28.06.2013 | ES | 08.07.2013 | IS | 27.07.2013 | PT | 29.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
MK | 27.03.2013 | ||
MT | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
TR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IE | 12.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
MT | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
IE | 12.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
IE | 12.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | CZ | 27.03.2013 | |
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 27.03.2013 | |
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | EE | 27.03.2013 | |
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 27.03.2013 | |
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 27.03.2013 | |
NO | 27.06.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0655593 (DAIMLER BENZ AEROSPACE AIRBUS [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 34 - column 5, line 10 * * column 6, lines 15-40; figures 1,2 *; | [AY]DE19952524 (EADS AIRBUS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, lines 53-66; figure 2 * [Y] 3,8,9,11; | [AY]US6832504 (BIRKMANN TIMOTHY [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 6, lines 8-26; figure 1 * [Y] 10; | [AY]WO2006105049 (BOEING CO [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0022]; figure 2 * [Y] 12; | [A]DE102005043610 (AIRBUS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]DE102006013143 (AIRBUS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0012]; figures 1a,2 *; | [Y]WO2007115830 (AIRBUS GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 15, line 1 - page 16, line 14 * * page 17, line 23 - page 18, line 11; figures 1,3 * |