EP2282904 - DRIVER PROTECTION SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IWS Ingenieurgesellschaft Weiner und Schröter MBH Marie-Curie-Strasse 6 47475 Kamp-Lintfort / DE | [2011/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHRÖTER, Oliver Kluse 4 45470 Mülheim a. d. Ruhr / DE | [2011/07] | Representative(s) | Frank, Hartmut, et al Bonsmann Bonsmann Frank Patentanwälte Reichspräsidentenstraße 21-25 45470 Mülheim a. d. Ruhr / DE | [2013/08] |
Former [2011/07] | Frank, Hartmut, et al Demski, Frank & Nobbe Reichspräsidentenstrasse 21-25 45470 Mülheim a. d. Ruhr / DE | Application number, filing date | 09745712.1 | 11.05.2009 | [2011/07] | WO2009EP55667 | Priority number, date | DE20081023750 | 15.05.2008 Original published format: DE102008023750 | [2011/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009138380 | Date: | 19.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2282904 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2282904 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60J5/04 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
B60R21/131 (EP,US);
B60J5/0487 (EP,US);
B66F17/003 (EP,US);
B66F9/07545 (EP,US);
B60R2021/0018 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/19] |
Former [2011/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FAHRERSCHUTZSYSTEM FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2011/07] | English: | DRIVER PROTECTION SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE | [2011/07] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PROTECTION DU CONDUCTEUR D'UN VÉHICULE | [2011/07] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 26.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.05.2009 | CY | 06.05.2015 | CZ | 06.05.2015 | DK | 06.05.2015 | EE | 06.05.2015 | FI | 06.05.2015 | HR | 06.05.2015 | LT | 06.05.2015 | LV | 06.05.2015 | MC | 06.05.2015 | MK | 06.05.2015 | MT | 06.05.2015 | PL | 06.05.2015 | RO | 06.05.2015 | SE | 06.05.2015 | SI | 06.05.2015 | SK | 06.05.2015 | TR | 06.05.2015 | IE | 11.05.2015 | LU | 11.05.2015 | BG | 06.08.2015 | NO | 06.08.2015 | GR | 07.08.2015 | IS | 06.09.2015 | PT | 07.09.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 11.05.2009 | |
CY | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
TR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IE | 11.05.2015 | ||
LU | 11.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | HU | 11.05.2009 | |
CY | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
TR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IE | 11.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
IE | 11.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
IE | 11.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
IE | 11.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 06.05.2015 | |
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 06.05.2015 | |
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 06.05.2015 | |
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 06.05.2015 | |
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5035094 (LEGARE DAVID J [US]) [X] 22-23 * abstract *; | [A]DE20002106U (FRITZMEIER SYSTEMS GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]DE20020521U (SAUERMANN HANS [DE]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2002153718 (SCHNEIDER BORIS SEBASTIAN HEIN [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]EP1305192 (IWS ING GES WEINER & SCHROETER [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004173041 (SAID BRIAN R [US]) [X] 22-23* abstract *; | [A]EP1686015 (INDIANA MILLS & MFG [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE20020521U | EP1305192 |