EP2280993 - PURIFICATION OF PEPTIDES PREPARED BY SOLID PHASE SYNTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.05.2014 [2014/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2011/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KORNBECK, Camilla Bistrupgaardsvej 16 DK-3460 Birkeroed / DK | 02 /
HANSEN, Thomas, Budde Aegirsgade 70 2. tv. DK-2200 Copenhagen N / DK | [2011/06] | Application number, filing date | 09745820.2 | 15.05.2009 | [2011/06] | WO2009EP55908 | Priority number, date | EP20080156221 | 15.05.2008 Original published format: EP 08156221 | [2011/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009138488 | Date: | 19.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2280993 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/435, C07K1/04, C07K14/00, C07K14/605 | [2011/06] | CPC: |
C07K14/605 (EP,US);
C07K1/16 (EP,US);
C07K1/18 (EP,US);
C07K1/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/06] | Title | German: | REINIGUNG VON DURCH FESTPHASENSYNTHESE HERGESTELLTEN PEPTIDEN | [2011/06] | English: | PURIFICATION OF PEPTIDES PREPARED BY SOLID PHASE SYNTHESIS | [2011/06] | French: | PURIFICATION DE PEPTIDES PRÉPARÉS PAR SYNTHÈSE EN PHASE SOLIDE | [2011/06] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/06] | 01.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9958475 (CAMBRIDGE COMBINATORIAL LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XY] - HAMID SALIMI, AZAM RAHIMI AND ALI POURJAVADI, "Applications of Polymeric Reagents in Organic Synthesis", MONATSHEFTE FÜR CHEMIE, on-line, (20070406), vol. 138, doi:10.1007/s00706-007-0616-3, pages 363 - 379, XP002538364 [X] 1-2,4-7,15 * the whole document * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00706-007-0616-3 | [XY] - MARTIN VIAU ET AL, "Study of Solid-Phase Synthesis and Purification Strategies for the Preparation of Polyglutamine Peptides", PEPTIDE SCIENCE, WILEY INTERSCIENCE, (20070101), vol. 88, no. 5, pages 754 - 763, XP007909257 [X] 1-2,4-7,15 * the whole document * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bip.20763 | [XY] - SHERRINGTON D.C., "Polymer-supported reagents, catalysts, and sorbents: Evolution and exploitation - A personalized view", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, on-line, (20010525), vol. 39, doi:10.1002/pola.1213, pages 2364 - 2377, XP002538365 [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/POLA.1213 | [XY] - PARLOW J J ET AL, "Solution-phase chemical library synthesis using polymer-assisted purification techniques.", CURRENT OPINION IN CHEMICAL BIOLOGY JUN 1999, (199906), vol. 3, no. 3, ISSN 1367-5931, pages 320 - 336, XP002538366 [X] 15 * the whole document * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1367-5931(99)80049-0 | [Y] - BOOTH & J C HODGES R J, "Polymer-supported quenching reagents for parallel purification", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC., US, (19970528), vol. 119, no. 21, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 4882 - 4886, XP002149792 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja9634637 | [Y] - LEY STEVEN V ET AL, "New tools and concepts for modern organic synthesis.", NATURE REVIEWS. DRUG DISCOVERY AUG 2002, (200208), vol. 1, no. 8, ISSN 1474-1776, pages 573 - 586, XP002538367 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NRD871 | [Y] - SIU JASON ET AL, "A phase-switch purification approach for the expedient removal of tagged reagents and scavengers following their application in organic synthesis.", ORGANIC & BIOMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY 7 SEP 2005, (20050907), vol. 3, no. 17, ISSN 1477-0520, pages 3140 - 3160, XP002538368 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B503778F | [X] - SUZUKI K ET AL, "TACTICS FOR SIMPLIFICATION OF PURIFICATION PROCESS IN THE SOLID PHASE PEPTIDE SYNTHESIS", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, TOKYO, JP, (19760101), vol. 24, no. 1, ISSN 0009-2363, pages 1 - 9, XP009088164 [X] 1,15 * pages 1-2,6-7 * | [X] - LEE SANG-HEON ET AL, "Synthesis, characterization, and pharmacokinetic studies of PEGylated glucagon-like peptide-1", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20050223), vol. 16, no. 2, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 377 - 382, XP002398436 [X] 15 * the whole document * | Examination | EP2181983 | by applicant | WO9943361 | WO0055119 | WO9943708 | WO0041546 | - SIEGEL ET AL., REGUL. PEPT., (1999), vol. 79, pages 93 - 102 | - MENTLEIN ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1993), vol. 214, pages 829 - 35 |