EP2276695 - DIRECT SYNTHESIS OF AQUEOUS HYDROGEN PEROXIDE SOLUTION AT THE SITE OF A PAPER MILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkema France 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2016/47] |
Former [2011/04] | For all designated states Arkema France 420 rue d'Estiennes d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUBOIS, Jean-Luc 190 Rue du Coteau F-69390 Millery / FR | [2011/04] | Representative(s) | Gorintin, Sarah, et al ARKEMA France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/47] | Gavin, Pablo ARKEMA FRANCE Propriété Industrielle 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2011/04] | Gavin, Pablo ARKEMA FRANCE Propriété Industrielle 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 09746019.0 | 30.04.2009 | [2011/04] | WO2009FR50797 | Priority number, date | FR20080052917 | 30.04.2008 Original published format: FR 0852917 | [2011/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009138700 | Date: | 19.11.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2276695 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2276695 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C01B15/029, D21C11/12, D21C9/16 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
D21C9/163 (EP,US);
C01B15/029 (EP,US);
D21C11/0071 (EP);
D21C11/06 (EP);
D21C9/1036 (EP,US);
D21C9/10 (EP,US);
Y02P20/129 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/47] |
Former [2011/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DIREKTE SYNTHESE EINER WÄSSRIGEN WASSERSTOFFPEROXIDLÖSUNG AM STANDORT EINER PAPIERFABRIK | [2011/04] | English: | DIRECT SYNTHESIS OF AQUEOUS HYDROGEN PEROXIDE SOLUTION AT THE SITE OF A PAPER MILL | [2011/04] | French: | SYNTHESE DIRECTE D'EAU OXYGENEE SUR LE SITE D'UNE PAPETERIE | [2011/04] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/04] | 03.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2009 | AT | 23.11.2016 | CY | 23.11.2016 | CZ | 23.11.2016 | DK | 23.11.2016 | EE | 23.11.2016 | HR | 23.11.2016 | IT | 23.11.2016 | LT | 23.11.2016 | LV | 23.11.2016 | MC | 23.11.2016 | MK | 23.11.2016 | MT | 23.11.2016 | NL | 23.11.2016 | PL | 23.11.2016 | RO | 23.11.2016 | SI | 23.11.2016 | SK | 23.11.2016 | TR | 23.11.2016 | BG | 23.02.2017 | NO | 23.02.2017 | GR | 24.02.2017 | IS | 23.03.2017 | BE | 30.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | GB | 30.04.2017 | IE | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | LU | 30.04.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 30.04.2009 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MK | 23.11.2016 | ||
MT | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
TR | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
GB | 30.04.2017 | ||
IE | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 30.04.2009 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MK | 23.11.2016 | ||
MT | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
GB | 30.04.2017 | ||
IE | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 30.04.2009 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MT | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
GB | 30.04.2017 | ||
IE | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.04.2009 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MT | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
GB | 30.04.2017 | ||
IE | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MT | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
GB | 30.04.2017 | ||
IE | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
GB | 30.04.2017 | ||
IE | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
GB | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 23.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO9410085 (CHEMREC AB [SE], et al) [DY] 1-7 * page 2, line 30 - page 6, line 28 *; | [DY]WO9605138 (PRINCETON ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY [US]) [DY] 1-7 * page 1, line 5 - page 2, line 5 * * page 4, line 28 - page 6, line 29 *; | [Y]DE10144013 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 55 *; | [Y]US2002106320 (ZHOU BING [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * page 1, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 2, paragraph 15 * |