EP2283411 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DEFINING AN ACTIVATION AREA WITHIN A REPRESENTATION SCENERY OF A VIEWER INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2011/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LASHINA, Tatiana, A. c/o High Tech Campus 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BEREZHNOY, Igor c/o High Tech Campus 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2011/07] | Representative(s) | Bekkers, Joost J.J. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | Bekkers, Joost J.J Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09746209.7 | 07.05.2009 | [2011/07] | WO2009IB51873 | Priority number, date | EP20080103954 | 14.05.2008 Original published format: EP 08103954 | [2011/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009138914 | Date: | 19.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2283411 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G06T7/337 (EP,US);
G06T2200/24 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20104 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/07] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR DEFINITION EINES AKTIVIERUNGSBEREICHS IN EINER DARSTELLUNGSSZENERIE EINER BETRACHTERSCHNITTSTELLE | [2011/07] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DEFINING AN ACTIVATION AREA WITHIN A REPRESENTATION SCENERY OF A VIEWER INTERFACE | [2011/07] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉFINITION D UNE ZONE D'ACTIVATION DANS UN DÉCOR DE REPRÉSENTATION D'UNE INTERFACE DE SPECTATEUR | [2011/07] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 14.11.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO0215110 (FRAUNHOFER CRCG INC [US], et al) [Y] 13 * abstract * * page 5, line 29 - page 6, line 17 * * page 40, line 17 - page 41, line 10 * [A] 1-12,14-15; | [A]EP1686554 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0072] ** claim 1 *; | [XYI]US2006202953 (PRYOR TIMOTHY R [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,12,14-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0034] , [0092] - [0106] - [0182] * * paragraph [0387] - paragraph [0397] * * claims 1-3 * [Y] 13 [I] 4-11 | by applicant | WO0215110 | US2006202953 | WO2007015200 | WO2007141675 | WO2008012717 |