EP2287264 - ADHESIVE SHEET FOR PROTECTION OF COATING FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitto Denko Corporation 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2011/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UESUGI, Masanori c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-1-2 Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
SHIRAI, Mitsuyoshi c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-1-2 Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 03 /
KAI, Makoto c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-1-2 Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 04 /
SUZUKI, Hidenori c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-1-2 Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 05 /
IMOTO, Eiichi c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-1-2 Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | Adam, Holger, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2014/38] |
Former [2011/08] | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09746450.7 | 08.04.2009 | [2011/08] | WO2009JP57221 | Priority number, date | JP20080126712 | 14.05.2008 Original published format: JP 2008126712 | [2011/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009139243 | Date: | 19.11.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2287264 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02, B32B27/00 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
C09J7/29 (EP,US);
C09J7/22 (EP,US);
C09J2301/162 (EP,US);
C09J2433/006 (EP,US);
C09J2475/006 (EP,US);
Y10T428/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/08] | Title | German: | HAFTFOLIE ALS SCHUTZ FÜR BESCHICHTUNGSFILM | [2011/08] | English: | ADHESIVE SHEET FOR PROTECTION OF COATING FILM | [2011/08] | French: | FEUILLE ADHÉSIVE POUR LA PROTECTION D UN FILM DE REVÊTEMENT | [2011/08] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2010 | Translation filed | 26.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 26.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPH10287849 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG); | [Y]JPH11123787 (KIMOTO KK); | [Y]JP2001520127 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG. CO.); | [Y]JP2002322359 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [A]JP2003253222 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JP2005187608 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) | by applicant | JP2001520127 | JP2003096140 | JP2003171411 | JP2004010662 | JP2004010661 |