EP2277858 - AMIDE COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | [2011/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOZAWA, Eisuke c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 02 /
IBUKA, Ryotaro c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 03 /
IKEGAI, Kazuhiro c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 04 /
MATSUURA, Keisuke c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 05 /
ZENKOH, Tatsuya c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 06 /
SEO, Ryushi c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 07 /
WATANUKI, Susumu c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 08 /
KAGEYAMA, Michihito c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | [2011/04] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/04] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09746580.1 | 12.05.2009 | [2011/04] | WO2009JP58821 | Priority number, date | JP20080127424 | 14.05.2008 Original published format: JP 2008127424 | [2011/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009139373 | Date: | 19.11.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2277858 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/48, C07D209/08, C07D401/06, C07C233/87, C07D263/58, C07D403/12, C07D333/68, C07D409/14, C07D217/04, C07D333/70, C07D401/12, C07D409/12, C07D207/34, A61K31/47, A61P13/12 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/04 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07C233/47 (EP,US);
C07C233/87 (EP,US);
C07C235/42 (EP,US);
C07C235/52 (EP,US);
C07C235/66 (EP,US);
C07C271/14 (EP,US);
C07C271/22 (EP,US);
C07D207/34 (EP,US);
C07D209/08 (EP,US);
C07D213/64 (EP,US);
C07D215/48 (EP,US);
C07D217/04 (EP,US);
C07D231/14 (EP,US);
C07D235/24 (EP,US);
C07D263/58 (EP,US);
C07D333/68 (EP,US);
C07D333/70 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,US);
C07D413/06 (EP,US);
C07D417/06 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D491/048 (EP,US);
C07C2601/02 (EP,US);
C07C2602/08 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/04] | C07C233/47, A61K31/166, A61K31/195, A61K31/381, A61K31/40, A61K31/404, A61K31/407, A61K31/415, A61K31/416, A61K31/4184, A61K31/422, A61K31/423, A61K31/427, A61K31/428, A61K31/437, A61K31/44, A61K31/4412 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/04] | Extension states | RS | 11.11.2010 | Title | German: | AMIDVERBINDUNG | [2011/04] | English: | AMIDE COMPOUND | [2011/04] | French: | COMPOSÉ AMIDE | [2011/04] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2010 | Translation filed | 11.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 11.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/04] | 31.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Divisional application(s) | EP12194789.9 / EP2565191 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO2007121578 (MERCK FROSST CANADA LTD [CA], et al) [XD] 1-3,11-14 * page 12, lines 3-10; examples 2,3,5-7,9,10; claims 1-9,15-18 *; | [XDP]WO2009005076 (ASTELLAS PHARMA INC [JP], et al)[XDP] 1-3,11-14; | [E]EP2172447 (ASTELLAS PHARMA INC [JP]) [E] 1-3,11-14 * paragraphs [0008] , [0028] - [0033]; examples 40-42; claims 1-4,6-10 * | International search | [X]JP2007504210 (PFIZER JAPAN INC.); | [X]JP2007508364 (ASUTERANDO YUKEI LTD.); | [X]JP2007533723 (PFIZER PRODUCTS INC.); | [X]JP2007536366 (PFIZER JAPAN INC.); | [X]JP2007536367 (PFIZER JAPAN INC.); | [X]WO2007143825 (MERCK FROSST CANADA LTD [CA], et al); | [X]WO2008017164 (MERCK FROSST CANADA LTD [CA], et al); | [XP]WO2008071736 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al); | [XP]WO2009005076 (ASTELLAS PHARMA INC [JP], et al); | [XP]WO2009056582 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) | by applicant | WO03016254 | WO2005021508 | WO2005061475 | WO2005105732 | WO2005105733 | WO2007121578 | WO2007143825 | WO2008017164 | WO2008104055 | WO2008123207 | WO2009005076 | - PROG. MED., (1985), vol. 5, pages 2157 - 2161 | - "Pharmaceutical Research and Development", Drug Design, HIROKAWA PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1990), vol. 7, pages 163 - 198 | - Jikken Kagaku koza, THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (2005), vol. 13 | - HEPATOLOGY RESEARCH JOURNAL, (2001), vol. 21, pages 252 - 260 |