EP2287623 - MICROANALYSIS CHIP ADHESIVE SHEET, MICROANALYSIS CHIP, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.03.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Kayaku Kabushiki Kaisha 11-2, Fujimi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8172 / JP | [2011/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Chihiro c/o NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA Functional Chemicals R&D Laboratories 31-12 Shimo 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | 02 /
SAKAI, Ryo c/o NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA Functional Chemicals R&D Laboratories 31-12 Shimo 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Masatoshi c/o NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA Functional Chemicals R&D Laboratories 31-12 Shimo 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | Hollatz, Christian Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Hollatz, Christian ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09746613.0 | 13.05.2009 | [2011/08] | WO2009JP58892 | Priority number, date | JP20080129102 | 16.05.2008 Original published format: JP 2008129102 | [2011/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009139407 | Date: | 19.11.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2287623 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/08, C12M1/00, C12N15/09, G01N33/543, G01N37/00 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
G01N33/543 (EP,US);
G01N33/54386 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/6837 (KR);
G01N33/54313 (KR);
G01N2035/00158 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/08] | Title | German: | HAFTFOLIE FÜR MIKROANALYSECHIP, MIKROANALYSECHIP UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2011/08] | English: | MICROANALYSIS CHIP ADHESIVE SHEET, MICROANALYSIS CHIP, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF | [2011/08] | French: | FEUILLE ADHÉSIVE POUR PUCE DE MICROANALYSE, PUCE DE MICROANALYSE ET SA FABRICATION | [2011/08] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2010 | Translation filed | 08.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 29.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JPH08122524 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1,5 * abstract * [A] 6-10 [Y] 2-4; | [XAY]JP2003295769 (KURAMOTO SANGYO KK) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025]; claim 2 * [A] 6-10 [Y] 2-4; | [A]EP1826563 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0077]; claim 6 * | International search | [Y]JP2000169816 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [A]JP2003207510 (TOYO B NET CO LTD); | [Y]JP2004174701 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [Y]WO2005026742 (NEC CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2006349509 (YAMAHA CORP); | [A]JP2007147539 (HITACHI LTD) | by applicant | JPH0516241 | JP2002139419 | JP2007240461 | - BLIN ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1976), vol. 3, page 2303 | - FAVALORO ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1980), vol. 65, page 718 |