EP2294527 - DISTRIBUTED DIGITAL RIGHTS MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. 2485 Augustine Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | For all designated states ATI Technologies ULC One Commerce Valley Drive East Markham, Ontario L3T 7X6 / CA | [2018/18] |
Former [2018/16] | For all designated states Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. 2485 Austine Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | ||
For all designated states ATI Technologies ULC One Commerce Valley Drive East Markham, Ontario L3T 7X6 / CA | |||
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. One Amd Place Sunnyvale, CA 94088 / US | ||
For all designated states ATI Technologies ULC One Commerce Valley Drive East Markham, Ontario L3T 7X6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOS REMEDIOS, Alwyn 26 La Maria Lane Vaughan Ontario L6A 3X2 / CA | 02 /
SCHERER, Stephan 2 Phillip Drive Ottawa Ontario K2E 6R7 / CA | 03 /
BAPST, Mark 4 Champlain Road South Barrington IL 60010 / US | 04 /
PATNE, Satyajit 241 Vintage Irvine CA 92620 / US | [2011/11] | Representative(s) | Robinson, David Edward Ashdown, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [2019/26] |
Former [2014/26] | Kenrick, Mark Lloyd, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2011/11] | Waldren, Robin Michael Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09747176.7 | 04.05.2009 | [2011/11] | WO2009US42670 | Priority number, date | US20080121558 | 15.05.2008 Original published format: US 121558 | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009140090 | Date: | 19.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2294527 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2294527 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/10, G06F1/32 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06F1/3203 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/11] | G06F21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/26] |
Former [2011/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERTEILTES DIGITALES RECHTEVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2011/11] | English: | DISTRIBUTED DIGITAL RIGHTS MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2011/11] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE DROITS NUMÉRIQUES DISTRIBUÉS | [2011/11] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 28.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.11.2018 | 20.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.01.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.05.2009 | AT | 26.06.2019 | CY | 26.06.2019 | CZ | 26.06.2019 | DK | 26.06.2019 | EE | 26.06.2019 | ES | 26.06.2019 | FI | 26.06.2019 | HR | 26.06.2019 | IT | 26.06.2019 | LT | 26.06.2019 | LV | 26.06.2019 | MC | 26.06.2019 | MK | 26.06.2019 | MT | 26.06.2019 | NL | 26.06.2019 | PL | 26.06.2019 | RO | 26.06.2019 | SE | 26.06.2019 | SI | 26.06.2019 | SK | 26.06.2019 | TR | 26.06.2019 | BG | 26.09.2019 | NO | 26.09.2019 | GR | 27.09.2019 | IS | 26.10.2019 | PT | 28.10.2019 | IE | 04.05.2020 | LU | 04.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | FR | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 04.05.2009 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
MT | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 04.05.2020 | ||
LU | 04.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 04.05.2020 | ||
LU | 04.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 04.05.2020 | ||
LU | 04.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 04.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1496660 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 1-21 * paragraph [0074]; figure 10 *; | [Y]US2008022108 (BRANNOCK KIRK D [US], et al) [Y] 1-21* paragraph [0013]; figure 2 *; | [X]US2008072070 (LAMACCHIA MICHAEL PHILIP [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * paragraphs [0005] , [0027] * |