EP2288788 - CONTINUOUS FIBERS FOR USE IN WELL COMPLETION, INTERVENTION, AND OTHER SUBTERRANEAN APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | For:BG
CZ
DE
DK
GR
HU
IE
IT
LT
NO
PL
RO
SI
SK
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG The Hague / NL | For:AT
BE
CH
EE
ES
FI
HR
IS
LI
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
PT
SE
Prad Research And Development Ltd P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town Tortola / VG | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | ||
For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town Tortola / VG | |||
For:BG
CZ
DE
DK
GR
HU
IE
IT
LT
NO
PL
RO
SI
SK
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG The Hague / NL | |||
For:AT
BE
CH
EE
ES
FI
HR
IS
LI
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
PT
SE
Prad Research And Development Ltd P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POITZSCH, Martin, E. 3 Beaver Road Derry NH 03038 / US | 02 /
SEN, Pabitra, N. 102 Nolen Lane Chapel Hill NC 27516 / US | 03 /
WIEMER, Karen 21 Portugal Street Cambridge / GB | 04 /
PICARD, Guillemette 2 Place du Marché Sainte Catherine 75004 Paris / FR | 05 /
VEMBUSUBRAMANIAN, Muthusamy 392 Pine Cone Strand Acton MA 01718 / US | [2011/28] |
Former [2011/12] | 01 /
POITZSCH, Martin, E. 3 Beaver Road Derry NH 03038 / US | ||
02 /
SEN, Pabitra, N. 102 Nolen Lane Chapel Hill NC 27516 / US | |||
03 /
WIEMER, Karen 21 Portugal Street Cambridge / GB | |||
04 /
PICARD, Guillemette 246, boulevard Raspail F-75014 Paris / FR | |||
05 /
VEMBUSUBRAMANIAN, Muthusamy 392 Pine Cone Strand Acton MA 01718 / US | |||
Former [2011/09] | 01 /
POITZSCH, Martin, E. 3 Beaver Road Derry NH 03038 / US | ||
02 /
SEN, Pabitra, N. 102 Nolen Lane Chapel Hill NC 27516 / US | |||
03 /
WIEMER, Karen 21 Portugal Street Cambridge / GB | |||
04 /
PICARD, Guillemette 246 boulevard Raspail F-75014 Paris / FR | |||
05 /
VEMBUSUBRAMANIAN, Muthusamy 392 Pine Cone Strand Acton MA 01718 / US | Representative(s) | Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | Ford, Michael Frederick Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB | ||
Former [2011/09] | Ford, Michael Frederick Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 09747672.5 | 15.05.2009 | [2011/09] | WO2009US44136 | Priority number, date | US20080121330 | 15.05.2008 Original published format: US 121330 | [2011/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009140591 | Date: | 19.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2288788 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/267, E21B33/13, E21B43/04, E21B43/26 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
E21B19/22 (EP,US);
E21B23/08 (EP,US);
E21B23/14 (EP,US);
E21B43/04 (EP,US);
E21B47/135 (EP,US);
E21B43/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/09] | E21B43/267, E21B33/13 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/09] | Title | German: | DURCHGEHENDE FASERN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BOHRLOCHKOMPLETTIERUNG UND -INTERVENTION SOWIE IN ANDEREN UNTERIRDISCHEN ANWENDUNGEN | [2011/09] | English: | CONTINUOUS FIBERS FOR USE IN WELL COMPLETION, INTERVENTION, AND OTHER SUBTERRANEAN APPLICATIONS | [2011/09] | French: | FIBRES CONTINUES A UTILISER DANS UNE OPERATION DE COMPLETION DE PUITS, UNE INTERVENTION ET D'AUTRES APPLICATIONS SOUTERRAINES | [2011/09] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2009 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/20] | 10.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02057805 (TUBEL PAULO S [US]) [X] 1,13,22 * the whole document * * paragraph [0026]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2004045705 (GARDNER WALLACE R [US], et al) [X] 1,10-13,17-22 * paragraphs [0018] , [0031] - [0045]; figures 3-8 * * proppant similar to graveling; see USPTO pair website; non-final and final rejection; paragraphs [0021] - [0026] * * the whole document *; | [A]US2004060697 (TILTON FREDERICK T [US], et al) [A] 8 * the whole document * * see USPTO final rejection; paragraphs [0029] - [0038]; figure 2 * * disclosing dispencing device 85on wireline tool *; | [A]US2005016730 (MCMECHAN DAVID E [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]US2005274513 (SCHULTZ ROGER L [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * paragraphs [0006] , [0037] , [0041] , [0042] , [0044] , [0045] , [0048]; figure 6 * * paragraphs [0049] - [0057]; figures 7-12 * * the whole document *; | [A]US2008066961 (AIVALIS JAMES G [US], et al) [A] 8,9 * paragraphs [0058] - [0062]; figure 9 * * the whole document * * see USPTO rejection * | International search | [A]US2003094281 (TUBEL PAULO S [US]); | [A]US2003122535 (WILLIAMS GLYNN R [GB], et al); | [A]US2003205083 (TUBEL PAULO [US], et al); | [A]US7082993 (AYOUB JOSEPH [US], et al) |