EP2358894 - TEST FOR PREDICTING NEUTRALIZATION OF ASPARAGINASE ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erytech Pharma 60 Avenue Rockefeller 69008 Lyon / FR | [2011/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GODFRIN, Yann 23 rue Henri Gorjus F-69004 Lyon / FR | [2011/34] | Representative(s) | Colombet, Alain André, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, Rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Colombet, Alain André, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | ||
Former [2011/34] | Colombet, Alain André, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09747859.8 | 06.11.2009 | [2011/34] | WO2009EP64793 | Priority number, date | FR20080057604 | 07.11.2008 Original published format: FR 0857604 | [2011/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010052315 | Date: | 14.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2358894 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2358894 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/37 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
C12Q1/34 (EP,US);
A61K38/50 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
C12Y305/01001 (EP,US);
G01N2333/982 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEST ZUR VORHERSAGE DER NEUTRALISIERUNG VON ASPARAGINASE-AKTIVITÄT | [2011/34] | English: | TEST FOR PREDICTING NEUTRALIZATION OF ASPARAGINASE ACTIVITY | [2011/34] | French: | ESSAI POUR LA PRÉDICTION DE LA NEUTRALISATION DE L'ACTIVITÉ DE L'ASPARAGINASE | [2011/34] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 23.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.11.2009 | AT | 08.01.2014 | BE | 08.01.2014 | BG | 08.01.2014 | CY | 08.01.2014 | CZ | 08.01.2014 | DK | 08.01.2014 | EE | 08.01.2014 | FI | 08.01.2014 | HR | 08.01.2014 | LT | 08.01.2014 | LV | 08.01.2014 | MK | 08.01.2014 | MT | 08.01.2014 | NL | 08.01.2014 | PL | 08.01.2014 | RO | 08.01.2014 | SE | 08.01.2014 | SI | 08.01.2014 | SK | 08.01.2014 | SM | 08.01.2014 | TR | 08.01.2014 | NO | 08.04.2014 | GR | 09.04.2014 | IS | 08.05.2014 | PT | 08.05.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 06.11.2009 | |
AT | 08.01.2014 | ||
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
TR | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 06.11.2009 | |
AT | 08.01.2014 | ||
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
TR | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 08.01.2014 | |
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [AD]FR2873925 (ERYTECH PHARMA SOC PAR ACTIONS [FR]) [AD] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [XI] - OGAWA C ET AL, "The ex vivo production of ammonia predicts biologic activity of L-asparaginase in children with ALL", BRITISH JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY, & 48TH ANNUAL SCIENTIFIC MEETING OF THE BRITISH-SOCIETY-FOR-HAEMATOLOGY; GLASGOW, UK; APRIL 07 -09, 2008, (200804), vol. 141, no. Suppl. 1, ISSN 0007-1048, page 96, XP002523664 [X] 1,3,12 * abstract * [I] 14-15 | [XD] - PANOSYAN EDUARD H ET AL, "Asparaginase antibody and asparaginase activity in children with higher-risk acute lymphoblastic leukemia: Children's Cancer Group Study CCG-1961.", JOURNAL OF PEDIATRIC HEMATOLOGY/ONCOLOGY : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PEDIATRIC HEMATOLOGY/ONCOLOGY APR 2004, (200404), vol. 26, no. 4, ISSN 1077-4114, pages 217 - 226, XP008105155 [XD] 1,3,12-13 * abstract * * page 225, column RIGHT, paragraphs 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00043426-200404000-00002 | [XPI] - DUFOUR EMMANUELLE ET AL, "An Assay to Predict L-Asparaginase Neutralization and Enzyme Loaded Red Blood Cells to Maintain in Vivo Efficacy", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200811), Database accession no. PREV200900257609, XP002563229 [XP] 1-2,4-5,8 * abstract * [I] 3,6-7,9-17 | [ ] - BLOOD, 50TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN- SOCIETY-OF-HEMATOLOGY; SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA; DECEMBER 06 -09, 2008, (200811), vol. 112, no. 11, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 336 - 337 | [AD] - ORSONNEAU J-L ET AL, "Dosage automatique en cinétique de l'activite L-asparaginase plasmatique en suivi thérapeutique des leucémies aiguës lymphoblastiques", ANNALES DE BIOLOGIE CLINIQUE 2004 SEP-OCT, (200409), vol. 62, no. 5, ISSN 0003-3898, pages 568 - 572, XP002523663 [AD] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - AVRAMIS VASSILIOS I ET AL, "Pharmacokinetic/pharmacodynamic relationships of asparaginase formulations: the past, the present and recommendations for the future", CLINICAL PHARMACOKINETICS, ADIS INTERNATIONAL LTD., AUCKLAND, NZ, vol. 44, no. 4, ISSN 0312-5963, (20050401), pages 367 - 393, XP008105154 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00003088-200544040-00003 | by applicant | FR408667 | WO2007103290 | - WANG ET AL., JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, vol. 239, no. 200, pages 75 - 83 | - MULLER H.J.; BOOS J., CRIT REV ONCOL/HEMATOL, (1998), no. 28, pages 97 - 113 | - BOOS ET AL., EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, (1996), vol. 32, pages 1544 - 1550 | - J.L. ORSONNEAU ET AL., ANN BIOL CLIN, (2004), vol. 62, pages 568 - 72 | - B. WANG ET AL., JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, (2000), vol. 239, pages 75 - 83 | - M.H. WOO ET AL., LEUKEMIA, (1998), vol. 12, pages 1527 - 1533 | - OGAWA C. ET AL., BRITISH JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY, vol. 141, no. 1, pages 1 - 121 | - E.H. PANOSYAN ET AL., J. PEDIATR. HEMATOL. ONCOL., (2004), vol. 26, no. 4, pages 217 - 226 | - ORSONNEAU ET AL., "Automatic kinetic assay of plasma L-asparaginase activity in therapeutic monitoring of acute lymphoblastic leukaemias", ANN BIOL CLIN, vol. 62, pages 568 - 572 |