EP2308079 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING PHOTOVOLTAIC MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grenzebach Maschinenbau GmbH Albanusstrasse 1 86663 Asbach-Bäumenheim / DE | [2011/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIGL, Helmut Schlesische Str. 344 94315 Straubing / DE | [2011/20] |
Former [2011/15] | 01 /
WEIGL, Helmut Schlesischestrasse 94315 Straubing / DE | Representative(s) | Kindermann, Peter Patentanwälte Kindermann Postfach 10 02 34 85593 Baldham / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | Kindermann, Peter Kindermann Patentanwälte Postfach 10 02 34 85593 Baldham / DE | ||
Former [2011/15] | Kindermann, Peter Kindermann Patentanwälte Postfach 10 02 34 85593 Baldham / DE | Application number, filing date | 09747918.2 | 18.08.2009 | [2011/15] | WO2009IB07059 | Priority number, date | DE20081036274 | 04.08.2008 Original published format: DE102008036274 | [2011/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010015942 | Date: | 11.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2308079 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2308079 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00, H01L21/677, H01L31/18 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
H01L21/67706 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/67126 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10036 (EP,KR,US);
B32B38/1833 (EP,KR,US);
B32B38/1858 (EP,KR,US);
B32B39/00 (EP,US);
B65G49/064 (EP,KR,US);
B65G49/066 (EP,US);
B65G49/068 (EP,US);
H01L21/67721 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/048 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/1876 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2457/12 (EP,KR,US);
B65G2249/02 (EP,US);
B65G2249/04 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,KR,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49002 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49764 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49829 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53048 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5313 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5317 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53187 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG PHOTOVOLTAISCHER MODULE | [2012/04] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING PHOTOVOLTAIC MODULES | [2011/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE MODULES PHOTOVOLTAÏQUES | [2011/15] |
Former [2011/15] | VERVAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG PHOTOVOLTAISCHER MODULE | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 07.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2009 | CY | 21.03.2012 | CZ | 21.03.2012 | DK | 21.03.2012 | EE | 21.03.2012 | FI | 21.03.2012 | HR | 21.03.2012 | LT | 21.03.2012 | LV | 21.03.2012 | MK | 21.03.2012 | MT | 21.03.2012 | PL | 21.03.2012 | RO | 21.03.2012 | SE | 21.03.2012 | SI | 21.03.2012 | SK | 21.03.2012 | SM | 21.03.2012 | TR | 21.03.2012 | BG | 21.06.2012 | NO | 21.06.2012 | GR | 22.06.2012 | IS | 21.07.2012 | PT | 23.07.2012 | IE | 18.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 18.08.2009 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
SM | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
IE | 18.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
SM | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
IE | 18.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
IE | 18.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
IE | 18.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
IE | 18.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 21.03.2012 | |
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 21.03.2012 | |
NO | 21.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4267003 (MESCH HANS G, et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]JPH06227655 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]JP2001180822 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1298080 (GRENZEBACH MASCHB GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]JP2004153137 (FUJI ELECTRIC HOLDINGS) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [AD]DE102004030411 (KURARAY SPECIALITIES EUROPE [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP1647532 (BYSTRONIC MASCH [CH]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]JP2007008698 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102005060452 (ARMATEC VIERHAUS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2004153137 | DE102004030411 | DE102005060452 |