EP2355937 - CHROMOPHORIC OR EFFECT-GENERATING MULTILAYER PAINT COATINGS HAVING PIGMENT-FREE COATS OF PAINT AS A FILLER SUBSTITUTE, THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Japan Ltd. 6-10-1 Roppongi Minato-ku Tokyo 106-6121 / JP | For all designated states BASF Coatings GmbH Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | [2015/16] |
Former [2014/48] | For all designated states BASF Japan Ltd. 6-10-1 Roppongi Minato-ku Tokyo 106-6121 / JP | ||
For all designated states BASF Coatings AG Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | |||
Former [2011/33] | For all designated states BASF Coatings Japan Ltd. Totsuka Plant 296, Shimokurata-cho Tosuka-ku Yokohama 244-0815 / JP | ||
For all designated states BASF Coatings AG Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAMES, Jörg Peter-Henlein-Str. 21 91207 Lauf / DE | 02 /
TANIGUCHI, Hitoshi 430-34 Matano-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama 245-0066 / JP | 03 /
WEGNER, Egon Bruktererstr. 6 48268 Greven / DE | 04 /
RICHERT, Michael Diemshoff 105 48282 Emsdetten / DE | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | 01 /
KRAMES, Jörg 5-18-5 Denenchofu Ota-ku Tokyo 145-0071 / JP | ||
02 /
TANIGUCHI, Hitoshi 430-34 Matano-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama 245-0066 / JP | |||
03 /
WEGNER, Egon Bruktererstr. 6 48268 Greven / DE | |||
04 /
RICHERT, Michael Diemshoff 105 48282 Emsdetten / DE | Representative(s) | Leifert, Elmar Leifert & Steffan Patentanwälte Postfach 10 40 09 40031 Düsseldorf / DE | [2011/33] | Application number, filing date | 09748252.5 | 02.11.2009 | [2011/33] | WO2009EP07832 | Priority number, date | DE20081054283 | 03.11.2008 Original published format: DE102008054283 | [2011/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010060523 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2355937 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B05D7/00, B05D1/04, B05D5/06 | [2011/33] | CPC: |
B05D7/572 (EP,US);
B05D5/06 (EP,KR,US);
B05D1/04 (EP,KR,US);
B05D7/00 (KR);
B05D7/57 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24868 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/33] | Title | German: | FARB- UND/ODER EFFEKTGEBENDE MEHRSCHICHTLACKIERUNGEN MIT PIGMENTFREIEN LACKIERUNGEN ALS FÜLLER-ERSATZ, IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2011/33] | English: | CHROMOPHORIC OR EFFECT-GENERATING MULTILAYER PAINT COATINGS HAVING PIGMENT-FREE COATS OF PAINT AS A FILLER SUBSTITUTE, THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF | [2011/33] | French: | REVÊTEMENTS MULTICOUCHES COLORANTS ET/OU À EFFET COMPRENANT DES PEINTURES SANS PIGMENT À LA PLACE DE CHARGES, LEUR FABRICATION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2011/33] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/33] | 27.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | 27.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1482014 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0007] , [0012] , [0028] , [0031] , [0038] , [0041] - [0043] - [0057] - [0058] * * tables 1-3 * * claim 1 * [I] 4; | [A]US4268542 (SAKAKIBARA TAKAO, et al) [A] 1-3,5-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0238037 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008051345 (DU PONT [US], et al) [A] 13 * abstract * * claims 1,9 * | Examination | WO03068417 |