EP2276680 - GAS BARRIER AND LIQUID ABSORBENT CONTAINER FOR THE PACKAGING OF FOOD PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cryovac, Inc. 100 Rogers Bridge Road Duncan, South Carolina 29334 / US | For all designated states Vitembal Societe Industrielle Quartier St. André 30210 Remoulins / FR | [2011/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LONGO, Eugenio Via Capuana 3 I-20017 Rho / IT | 02 /
BALDET, Philippe 24 rue de la clède F-30210 Collias / FR | 03 /
RIZZI, Jvanohe Via Nazario Sauro 133 I-20025 Legnano / IT | 04 /
CAPITANI, Stefano Via Alciato 19 I-22100 Como / IT | [2011/04] | Representative(s) | Fraire, Cristina, et al PGA S.p.A. Via Mascheroni, 31 20145 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Fraire, Cristina, et al Ponzellini, Gioia e Associati S.r.l. Via Mascheroni, 31 20145 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2011/04] | Fraire, Cristina Sealed Air S.r.l. Via Trento, 7 20017 Passirana di Rho (MI) / IT | Application number, filing date | 09749703.6 | 29.04.2009 | [2011/04] | WO2009EP55175 | Priority number, date | EP20080290480 | 22.05.2008 Original published format: EP 08290480 | [2011/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009141213 | Date: | 26.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2276680 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/26 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
B65D81/262 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/04] | Title | German: | GASBARRIERE UND FLÜSSIGKEITSABSORBIERENDER BEHÄLTER ZUM VERPACKEN VON LEBENSMITTELPRODUKTEN | [2011/04] | English: | GAS BARRIER AND LIQUID ABSORBENT CONTAINER FOR THE PACKAGING OF FOOD PRODUCTS | [2011/04] | French: | CONTENANT ABSORBEUR DE LIQUIDES ET BARRIÈRE DE GAZ POUR L'EMBALLAGE DE PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES | [2011/04] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/04] | 31.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/08] | 05.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO8600275 (GARWOOD JAMES VALENTINE HENRY [AU]) [DX] 1,3,5-9,11-14 * page 6 - page 19 *; | [DX]WO2007059187 (PACTIV CORP [US], et al) [DX] 1,3,4,7,14,15 * page 15 * * page 40, line 23 - page 41, line 13 * * page 43, lines 15-18 *; | [DX]FR2564807 (FRAIGNEAU MICHEL [FR]) [DX] 1-3,7,9,10 * pages 1-4; figures 4,5; claim 5 *; | [A]WO9932372 (LINPAC PLASTICS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 5 * page 4 - page 7 * |