EP2310604 - MOVABLE WALL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Veijalainen, Panu Vehaksenkuja 6 02330 Espoo / FI | [2011/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2012/40] |
Former [2011/16] | Papula Oy Mechelininkatu 1 a 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 09749978.4 | 08.05.2009 | [2011/16] | WO2009FI50378 | Priority number, date | FI20080000171U | 23.05.2008 Original published format: FI 20080171 U | [2011/16] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009141494 | Date: | 26.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2310604 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2310604 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 26.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/58, E06B3/92, E04B2/82 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
E05D15/58 (EP);
E04B2/827 (EP);
E06B3/924 (EP);
E05D2015/588 (EP);
E05Y2201/684 (EP);
E05Y2800/22 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2011/16] | E05D15/58, E06B3/92 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/16] | Title | German: | BEWEGLICHES WANDSYSTEM | [2014/21] | English: | MOVABLE WALL SYSTEM | [2011/16] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PAROI MOBILE | [2011/16] |
Former [2011/16] | BEWEGLICHES WARNSYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 27.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.05.2009 | AT | 08.10.2014 | BE | 08.10.2014 | BG | 08.10.2014 | CY | 08.10.2014 | CZ | 08.10.2014 | DK | 08.10.2014 | ES | 08.10.2014 | HR | 08.10.2014 | IT | 08.10.2014 | LT | 08.10.2014 | LV | 08.10.2014 | MC | 08.10.2014 | MK | 08.10.2014 | MT | 08.10.2014 | NL | 08.10.2014 | PL | 08.10.2014 | RO | 08.10.2014 | SI | 08.10.2014 | SK | 08.10.2014 | TR | 08.10.2014 | GR | 09.01.2015 | IS | 08.02.2015 | PT | 09.02.2015 | GB | 08.05.2015 | IE | 08.05.2015 | LU | 08.05.2015 | CH | 31.05.2015 | LI | 31.05.2015 | FR | 01.06.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/46] | HU | 08.05.2009 | |
AT | 08.10.2014 | ||
BE | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
GB | 08.05.2015 | ||
IE | 08.05.2015 | ||
LU | 08.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
FR | 01.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 08.05.2009 | |
AT | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
GB | 08.05.2015 | ||
IE | 08.05.2015 | ||
LU | 08.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
FR | 01.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
GB | 08.05.2015 | ||
IE | 08.05.2015 | ||
LU | 08.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
FR | 01.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
GB | 08.05.2015 | ||
IE | 08.05.2015 | ||
LU | 08.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
FR | 01.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
GB | 08.05.2015 | ||
IE | 08.05.2015 | ||
LU | 08.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 08.05.2015 | ||
LU | 08.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
LU | 08.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
LU | 08.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 08.10.2014 | |
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 08.10.2014 | |
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 08.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1085156 (SOLARLUX ALUMINIUM SYS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0008] - [0013] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2004022897 (GLOBAL FINANCIAL ADVISORS LTD; SARNELL JOHAN [SE]; JOHANSSON AAKE [SE]) [A] 1-5 * page 5, line 1 - page 7, line 22 * * figures 1-7 *; | [AD]DE10333612 (SKS STAKUSIT BAUTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-5 * paragraphs [0022] - [0032] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO0039426 (LMV ALNOVA BALKONGSYSTEM I SVE [SE]; PERSSON BO [SE]) [A] 1-5 * page 8, line 4 - page 11, line 16 * * figures 1-3 * | International search | [AP]EP1970515 (SUOMEN PARVEKETEKNIIKKA OY); | [A]WO0039426 (LMV ALNOVA BALKONGSYSTEM I SVE ET AL.); | [A]WO2004022897 (GLOBAL FINANCIAL ADVISORS LTD ET AL.); | [A]EP1085156 (SOLARLUX ALUMINIUM SYSTEME GMB); | [A]WO9308355 (SJOEHOLM JARMO) |