EP2278534 - IC CARD, IC CARD SYSTEM, AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/04] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UMEZAWA, Katsuyuki c/o Systems Development Laboratory HITACHI LTD. 1099 Ozenji Aso-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 215-0013 / JP | 02 /
MATSUMOTO, Kenji c/o Security&Smart ID Solutions Division HITACHI LTD. 890 Kashimada Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-8567 / JP | 03 /
TERADA, Katsuya c/o Security&Smart ID Solutions Division HITACHI LTD. 890 Kashimada Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-8567 / JP | 04 /
YAMAGUCHI, Yoshiaki c/o Security&Smart ID Solutions Division HITACHI LTD. 890 Kashimada Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-8567 / JP | [2011/04] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/04] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09750298.3 | 02.02.2009 | [2011/04] | WO2009JP00385 | Priority number, date | JP20080130616 | 19.05.2008 Original published format: JP 2008130616 | [2011/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009141936 | Date: | 26.11.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2278534 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/60, G06K19/077, G07C9/00 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
G06F21/606 (EP,US);
G07C9/257 (EP,US);
G06K19/077 (EP,US);
G06K19/07726 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/04] | G06K19/10, G06F21/20, G06F21/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/04] | Title | German: | IC-KARTE, IC-KARTENSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2011/04] | English: | IC CARD, IC CARD SYSTEM, AND METHOD THEREOF | [2011/04] | French: | CARTE DE CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ, SYSTÈME DE CARTE DE CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ, ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2011/04] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2010 | Translation filed | 31.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2010 | Examination requested [2011/04] | 14.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/22] | 13.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9933219 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [IY]WO0036566 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [I] 1-5,9,16-21 * page 7, line 29 - page 10, line 13; figures 3,4 * [Y] 6-8,15; | [XY]EP1679666 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,10-14 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0066] * * pages 85-86 * * figures 1,4 * [Y] 6-8,15; | [Y]US2007226793 (TANABIKI MASAMOTO [JP], et al) [Y] 6-8,15 * paragraphs [0019] - [0020] * * paragraph [0070] * * paragraphs [0150] - [0152] * | International search | [A]JP2003016397 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2004287805 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]WO2005117336 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2006195591 (FUJITSU LTD, et al) | by applicant | JP2006073021 | JP2006195591 | JP2006309475 | JP3905961B |