EP2311233 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SECURED COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uniloc USA, Inc. Legacy Town Center I 7160 Dallas Parkway 380 Plano TX 75024 / US | [2012/35] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states Uniloc USA, Inc. 2151 Michelson Drive, Suite 100 Irvine, CA 92612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ETCHEGOYEN, Craig, S. C/o Uniloc Usa Inc. 2151 Michelson Drive Suite 100 Irvine, CA 92612 / US | 02 /
HARJANTO, Dono C/o Uniloc Usa Inc. 2151 Michelson Drive Suite 100 Irvine, CA 92612 / US | 03 /
DAVIS, Bradley, C. C/o Uniloc Usa Inc. 2151 Michelson Drive Suite 100 Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Casbon, Paul Richard, et al Lucas & Co 135 Westhall Road GB-Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Casbon, Paul Richard, et al Lucas & Co 135 Westhall Road GB-Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09751343.6 | 19.05.2009 | [2011/16] | WO2009US44467 | Priority number, date | US20080055129 | 21.05.2008 Original published format: US 55129 | [2011/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009143115 | Date: | 26.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2311233 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/08, G08G1/00 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04L67/125 (EP,US);
H04L63/0272 (EP,US);
H04L63/1408 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/16] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR GESICHERTE KOMMUNIKATION | [2011/16] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SECURED COMMUNICATION | [2011/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SÉCURISÉE | [2011/16] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 01.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/24] | 09.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005104686 (IPASS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-33 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0027] , [0029] - [0033] - [0037] , [0042] , [0073] - [0080]; figures 1A,4 *; | [X]EP1670188 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1-33 * paragraphs [0011] , [0033] - [0042] - [0053]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2007060516 (LO TEDDY YEUNG MAN [CN]) [A] 1-33 * paragraphs [0039] , [0043] - [0050] - [0057] - [0059] - [0067] , [0068]; figures 1,2,6 *; | [A] - ECONOLITE, "Econolite and Uniloc Partner to Bring Unmatched Infrastructure Security to Advanced Traffic Control Networks with Launch of StrongPoint", (20080304), URL: http://www.econolite.com/docs/press/20080304_Econolite_StrongPoint.pdf, (20091012), XP002550941 [A] 1-33 * the whole document * | [A] - ANGHA ET AL, "Securing Transportation Network Infrastructure With Patented Technology Of Device Loching -Developed vy UNILOC USA", (20061024), URL: http://www.dksassociates.com/admin/paperfile/ITS%20World%20Paper%20Submission_Uniloc%20_2_.pdf, (20091013), XP002550942 [A] 1-33 * the whole document * |