EP2286364 - CENTRALIZED SCANNER DATABASE WITH OPTIMAL DEFINITION DISTRIBUTION USING NETWORK QUERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYMANTEC CORPORATION 350 Ellis Street Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2011/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SZOR, Peter C/o Symantec Corporation 350 Ellis Street Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Lieb, Fabian Lavoix Bayerstraße 85a 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09751500.1 | 20.05.2009 | [2011/08] | WO2009US44713 | Priority number, date | US20080124458 | 21.05.2008 Original published format: US 124458 | [2011/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009143272 | Date: | 26.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2286364 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
H04L63/1416 (EP,US);
G06F21/56 (EP,US);
G06F21/564 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/08] | Title | German: | ZENTRALISIERTE SCANNERDATENBANK MIT OPTIMALER DEFINITIONSVERTEILUNG ANHAND VON NETZWERKABFRAGEN | [2011/08] | English: | CENTRALIZED SCANNER DATABASE WITH OPTIMAL DEFINITION DISTRIBUTION USING NETWORK QUERIES | [2011/08] | French: | BASE DE DONNÉES DE SCANNEUR CENTRALISÉE AVEC DISTRIBUTION DE DÉFINITION OPTIMALE À L'AIDE DE REQUÊTES RÉSEAU | [2011/08] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 25.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.01.2018 | 23.01.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/23] | 03.02.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005086520 (DHARMAPURIKAR SARANG [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 1, paragraphs 2,8 * * page 2, paragraphs 32,33 * * page 3, paragraph 43 * * page 6, paragraph 87 *; | [X]US2007240218 (TUVELL GEORGE [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 1, paragraph 11 * * page 3, paragraph 42 * * page 5, paragraph 52 - page 7, paragraph 77 * * page 19, paragraphs 266,267 * * page 21, paragraph 320 *; | [X]US5960170 (CHEN EVA [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 7, line 21 - column 8, line 16 * * column 11, line 52 - column 12, line 53 *; | [X]US2006174345 (FLANAGAN MICHAEL [AU], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 1, paragraph 9 * * page 2, paragraph 14 * * page 4, paragraphs 44,48 * |