EP2355647 - DEVICE FOR ACCOMMODATING PLANT MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/33] | DEVICE FOR ACCOMMODATING PLANT MATERIAL AND SYSTEM FOR PROCESSING THEREOF | ||
[2019/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vitro Plus B.V. De Roterij 26 4328 BA Burgh-Haamstede / NL | [2019/48] |
Former [2011/33] | For all designated states Visser's-Gravendeel Holding B.V. Mijlweg 18 3295 KH 's-Gravendeel / NL | ||
For all designated states Vitro Plus C.V. De Roterij 26 4328 BA Burgh-Haamstede / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIJL, John De Roterij 26 NL-4328 BA Burgh-Haamstede / NL | [2011/33] | Representative(s) | Grootscholten, Johannes A.M., et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2011/33] | Grootscholten, Johannes A.M., et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 09751995.3 | 09.11.2009 | [2011/33] | WO2009NL50676 | Priority number, date | NL20081036276 | 03.12.2008 Original published format: NL 1036276 | [2011/33] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010064900 | Date: | 10.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2355647 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2355647 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/02, A01G9/029, A01G9/08 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
A01G9/083 (EP,US);
A01G9/027 (EP);
A01G9/0295 (EP,US);
A01G9/0299 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/33] | A01G9/10, A01G9/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] |
Former [2011/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFNAHME VON PFLANZENMATERIAL | [2019/49] | English: | DEVICE FOR ACCOMMODATING PLANT MATERIAL | [2019/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LOGER DU MATÉRIEL VÉGÉTAL | [2019/49] |
Former [2011/33] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFNAHME VON PFLANZENMATERIAL UND SYSTEM ZU DESSEN VERARBEITUNG | ||
Former [2011/33] | DEVICE FOR ACCOMMODATING PLANT MATERIAL AND SYSTEM FOR PROCESSING THEREOF | ||
Former [2011/33] | DISPOSITIF POUR LOGER DU MATÉRIEL VÉGÉTAL ET SYSTÈME POUR TRAITER CELUI-CI | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/33] | 28.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.11.2009 | AT | 18.03.2020 | CY | 18.03.2020 | CZ | 18.03.2020 | DK | 18.03.2020 | EE | 18.03.2020 | ES | 18.03.2020 | FI | 18.03.2020 | HR | 18.03.2020 | IT | 18.03.2020 | LT | 18.03.2020 | LV | 18.03.2020 | MC | 18.03.2020 | MK | 18.03.2020 | MT | 18.03.2020 | PL | 18.03.2020 | RO | 18.03.2020 | SE | 18.03.2020 | SI | 18.03.2020 | SK | 18.03.2020 | SM | 18.03.2020 | TR | 18.03.2020 | BG | 18.06.2020 | NO | 18.06.2020 | GR | 19.06.2020 | PT | 12.08.2020 | GB | 09.11.2020 | IE | 09.11.2020 | LU | 09.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | FR | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 09.11.2009 | |
AT | 18.03.2020 | ||
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MK | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
GB | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 09.11.2020 | ||
LU | 09.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
FR | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 09.11.2009 | |
AT | 18.03.2020 | ||
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
GB | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 09.11.2020 | ||
LU | 09.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
FR | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
GB | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 09.11.2020 | ||
LU | 09.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
FR | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
GB | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 09.11.2020 | ||
LU | 09.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
FR | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
GB | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 09.11.2020 | ||
LU | 09.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
FR | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 09.11.2020 | ||
LU | 09.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
FR | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 09.11.2020 | ||
LU | 09.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 09.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
NO | 18.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB191013471 (COOKE THOMAS PERCY) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [XA]US4006558 (NEDDO KEITH S, et al) [X] 1-11 * column 3, line 43 - column 5, line 24; figure - * [A] 12; | [X]EP0120642 (WIESINGER F) [X] 1-9,11,12 * page 2, line 14 - page 4, line 34; figure - *; | [X]EP0906722 (LOMONACO ANGELO [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,7-10 * figure - *; | [X]US2007190521 (MACISAAC SUSAN [US], et al) [X] 15-20* figure - * | Examination | US5241917 | US2008276529 |