EP2347425 - ELECTROMAGNET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADLER, Bernhard Virchowstrasse 45 89075 Ulm / DE | 02 /
LORITZ, Steffen Schleifaecker 88 89081 Ulm / DE | 03 /
STITZ, Matthias Gellenäckerweg 7 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | 04 /
WITTE, Torsten Am Oberen Berg 5 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | 05 /
BOSCH, Ralf Altheimer Weg 5 89177 Boerslingen / DE | [2011/30] | Representative(s) | Thürer, Andreas Bosch Rexroth AG BR/IPR Zum Eisengiesser 1 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | Thürer, Andreas Bosch Rexorth AG Zum Eisengießer 1 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | ||
Former [2011/30] | Thürer, Andreas Bosch Rexorth AG Zum Eisengießer 1 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 09752112.4 | 30.10.2009 | [2011/30] | WO2009EP07782 | Priority number, date | DE20081054184 | 31.10.2008 Original published format: DE102008054184 | DE20091007983 | 07.02.2009 Original published format: DE102009007983 | [2011/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010049166 | Date: | 06.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2347425 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2347425 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01F7/127, H01F7/16, F16K31/06 | [2011/30] | CPC: |
H01F7/1607 (EP,US);
F16K31/0675 (EP,US);
H01F7/127 (EP,US);
H01F2007/163 (EP,US);
H01F7/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMAGNET | [2011/30] | English: | ELECTROMAGNET | [2011/30] | French: | ELECTRO-AIMANT | [2011/30] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 17.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/52] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.10.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 24.10.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.11.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2009 | CY | 14.01.2015 | CZ | 14.01.2015 | DK | 14.01.2015 | EE | 14.01.2015 | ES | 14.01.2015 | FI | 14.01.2015 | HR | 14.01.2015 | IT | 14.01.2015 | LT | 14.01.2015 | LV | 14.01.2015 | MC | 14.01.2015 | MK | 14.01.2015 | MT | 14.01.2015 | NL | 14.01.2015 | PL | 14.01.2015 | PT | 14.01.2015 | RO | 14.01.2015 | SE | 14.01.2015 | SI | 14.01.2015 | SK | 14.01.2015 | SM | 14.01.2015 | TR | 14.01.2015 | BG | 14.04.2015 | NO | 14.04.2015 | GR | 15.04.2015 | IS | 14.05.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 30.10.2009 | |
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MK | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
SM | 14.01.2015 | ||
TR | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 30.10.2009 | |
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
SM | 14.01.2015 | ||
TR | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 14.01.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102005039640 (BUERKERT WERKE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-5,10-24 * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] - [0025] , [0027] , [0028] , [0030] , [0032]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US4805870 (MERTZ DENNY W [US]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 17; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US3727160 (CHURCHILL A) [X] 1-4,6-9 * column 1, lines 7-16 * * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 12 * * column 3, lines 31-40 * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]US4649360 (RIEFLER ROGER G [US], et al) [X] 1-5,16-24 * column 1, lines 51-58 * * column 3, lines 44-52 * * column 4, lines 18-22 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US4055823 (ANDERSEN ERIK) [X] 1-5,16-24 * column 2, lines 4-7,25-39 * * column 3, lines 8-32 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE8704132U (ELEKTROTEILE GMBH, 7772 UHLDINGEN-MUEHLHOFEN, DE) [A] 16-24 * figures 1,2,5; claims 11,12 * |