EP2358323 - HANDLING SYSTEM AND METHOD OF ARRANGING A PERSON SUPPORTED BY A HANDLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hecare Systems APS Holtvej 4 6470 Sydals / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | For all designated states Hecare Systems APS Holtvej 4 8470 Sydals / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAMKOW, Asger Stavensbo̸lgade 12 DK-6440 Augustenborg / DK | 02 /
SUNDBÆK, Steffen Stavensbo̸lgade 8, 1. sal DK-6440 Augustenborg / DK | [2011/34] | Representative(s) | Olesen, Kaj, et al Patentgruppen A/S Arosgaarden Aaboulevarden 31 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [2011/34] | Application number, filing date | 09752273.4 | 16.11.2009 | [2011/34] | WO2009DK00237 | Priority number, date | DK20080001647 | 24.11.2008 Original published format: DK 200801647 | [2011/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010057492 | Date: | 27.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2358323 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/10 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
A61G7/1015 (EP,US);
A61G7/1051 (EP,US);
A61G7/1061 (EP,US);
A61G7/1042 (EP,US);
A61G7/1046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/34] | Title | German: | HANDHABUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANORDNUNG EINER VON EINEM HANDHABUNGSSYSTEM GESTÜTZTEN PERSON | [2011/34] | English: | HANDLING SYSTEM AND METHOD OF ARRANGING A PERSON SUPPORTED BY A HANDLING SYSTEM | [2011/34] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MANIPULATION ET PROCÉDÉ D'AGENCEMENT D'UNE PERSONNE SUPPORTÉE PAR UN SYSTÈME DE GESTION | [2011/34] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 23.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/45] | 27.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4627119 (HACHEY FRANCIS J [US], et al) [X] 1-2,6-7,10-13 * column 3, line 48 - line 56; figure - *; | [X]US5499408 (NIX JOHN W [US]) [X] 1-2,6-7,10-13 * abstract *; | [X]EP0947187 (WILLIAMSON THEODORE A [US]) [X] 1-2,6-7,10-15* paragraph [0035]; figure - *; | [X]US2005044629 (ROUSE SAMUEL K [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-13 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032]; figure - * |