EP2373228 - SURGICAL SUTURE MATERIAL WITH BARBS CUT INTO IT IN THE UNDRAWN STATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aesculap AG Am Aesculap-Platz 78532 Tuttlingen/Donau / DE | For all designated states ITV Denkendorf Produktservice GmbH Körschtalstrasse 26 73770 Denkendorf / DE | [2011/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ODERMATT, Erich Fernsichtstrasse 7a CH-8200 Schaffhausen / CH | 02 /
BERNDT, Ingo Mainburgerstrasse7 81369 München / DE | 03 /
KÖNIG, Silke Sonnenhalde 15 78628 Rottweil / DE | 04 /
MÜLLER, Erhard Reinbeckstrasse 29c 70565 Stuttgart / DE | 05 /
OBERHOFFNER, Sven Quellenweg 6 71384 Weinstadt-Endersbach / DE | 06 /
PLANCK, Heinrich Weinbergstrasse 66 72622 Nürtingen / DE | [2012/52] |
Former [2012/44] | 01 /
ODERMATT, Erich Fernsichtstrasse 7a CH-8200 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
02 /
BERNDT, Ingo Hasslerstrasse 22- 24 52066 Aachen / DE | |||
03 /
KÖNIG, Silke Sonnenhalde 15 78628 Rottweil / DE | |||
04 /
MÜLLER, Erhard Reinbeckstrasse 29c 70565 Stuttgart / DE | |||
05 /
OBERHOFFNER, Sven Quellenweg 6 71384 Weinstadt-Endersbach / DE | |||
06 /
PLANCK, Heinrich Weinbergstrasse 66 72622 Nürtingen / DE | |||
Former [2011/45] | 01 /
ODERMATT, Erich Fernsichtstrasse 7a CH-8200 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
02 /
BERNDT, Ingo Hasslerstrasse 22- 24 52066 / DE | |||
03 /
KÖNIG, Silke Sonnenhalde 15 78628 Rottweil / DE | |||
04 /
MÜLLER, Erhard Reinbeckstrasse 29c 70565 Stuttgart / DE | |||
05 /
OBERHOFFNER, Sven Quellenweg 6 71384 Weinstadt-Endersbach / DE | |||
06 /
PLANCK, Heinrich Weinbergstrasse 66 72622 Nürtingen / DE | |||
Former [2011/41] | 01 /
ODERMATT, Erich Fernsichtstrasse 7a CH-8200 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
02 /
BERNDT, Ingo Im Steinigen Tal 9 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | |||
03 /
KÖNIG, Silke Sonnenhalde 15 78628 Rottweil / DE | |||
04 /
MÜLLER, Erhard Reinbeckstrasse 29c 70565 Stuttgart / DE | |||
05 /
OBERHOFFNER, Sven Quellenweg 6 71384 Weinstadt-Endersbach / DE | |||
06 /
PLANCK, Heinrich Weinbergstrasse 66 72622 Nürtingen / DE | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 09752290.8 | 06.11.2009 | WO2009EP07950 | Priority number, date | DE20081057218 | 06.11.2008 Original published format: DE102008057218 | [2011/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010052007 | Date: | 14.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2373228 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2373228 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/06, A61B17/00 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
A61B17/06166 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06176 (EP,US);
Y10T83/0341 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHES NAHTMATERIAL MIT IM UNGEZOGENEN ZUSTAND EINGEARBEITETEN WIDERHAKEN | [2011/41] | English: | SURGICAL SUTURE MATERIAL WITH BARBS CUT INTO IT IN THE UNDRAWN STATE | [2011/41] | French: | MATÉRIAU DE SUTURE CHIRURGICAL AVEC DÉCOUPAGE D'ARDILLONS DANS CELUI-CI DANS L'ÉTAT NON ÉTIRÉ | [2011/41] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 06.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP13166698.4 / EP2638863 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.05.2013 | EE | 08.05.2013 | FI | 08.05.2013 | HR | 08.05.2013 | LT | 08.05.2013 | LV | 08.05.2013 | MC | 08.05.2013 | MK | 08.05.2013 | MT | 08.05.2013 | RO | 08.05.2013 | SI | 08.05.2013 | SK | 08.05.2013 | SM | 08.05.2013 | BG | 08.08.2013 | NO | 08.08.2013 | GR | 09.08.2013 | IS | 08.09.2013 | LU | 06.11.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | CY | 08.05.2013 | |
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
MK | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
SM | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
LU | 06.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 08.05.2013 | |
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
MK | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
SM | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 08.05.2013 | |
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
SM | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 08.05.2013 | |
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 08.05.2013 | |
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 08.05.2013 | |
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | CY | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 08.05.2013 | |
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 08.05.2013 | |
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 08.05.2013 | |
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 08.05.2013 | |
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 08.05.2013 | |
NO | 08.08.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB1091282 (NAT RES DEV) [X] 1-3,7,9 * page 3, line 128 - page 4, line 10 * [I] 6,8,10,12-17; | [XPI]WO2009105663 (ANGIOTECH PHARM INC [CA], et al) [XP] 1-5,11,21 * paragraphs [0106] , [0158] , [0159]; figures 1a-3a,15b * [I] 23-31; | [X]EP1867288 (QUILL MEDICAL INC [US]) [X] 19,20 * paragraph [0126]; figures 1a,6a,13a-13d *; | [A]US2008221618 (CHEN GAOYUAN [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0038] * * figures 1d,2,5 * | by applicant | US3123077 | EP1559266 | EP1560683 | EP1556946 | GB1091282 | WO2009105663 | EP1867288 |