EP2344331 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING A LAMINATED GLAZING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/29] | METHOD FOR MAKING A LAMINATED GLAZING | ||
[2016/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Glass France 18 Avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2011/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DECOURCELLE, Romain 5 square Alphonse Chovet F-60200 Compiegne / FR | 02 /
LEVASSEUR, Fabien 42 avenue de la Libération F-60150 Longueil-Annel / FR | 03 /
NUGUE, Jean-Clément 55, 53 avenue de Gouvieux F-60260 Lamorlaye / FR | [2011/29] | Representative(s) | Saint-Gobain Recherche Département Propriété Industrielle 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/37] | Bregal, Laurence Saint-Gobain Recherche Département Propriété Industrielle 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | ||
Former [2011/29] | Bregal, Laurence Saint-Gobain Recherche Département Propriété Industrielle 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | Application number, filing date | 09752433.4 | 30.09.2009 | [2011/29] | WO2009FR51860 | Priority number, date | FR20080056642 | 01.10.2008 Original published format: FR 0856642 | [2011/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010037973 | Date: | 08.04.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2344331 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2344331 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10, C03C27/12, G01N3/32 | [2011/29] | CPC: |
B32B17/10036 (EP,US);
C03C27/00 (KR);
B32B17/10 (KR);
B32B17/10761 (EP,US);
C03C27/10 (KR);
G01N3/32 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] |
Former [2011/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER VERBUNDVERGLASUNG | [2016/21] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING A LAMINATED GLAZING | [2016/21] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN VITRAGE FEUILLETE | [2011/29] |
Former [2011/29] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERBUNDGLAS | ||
Former [2011/29] | METHOD FOR MAKING A LAMINATED GLAZING | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 25.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2009 | AT | 14.09.2016 | CY | 14.09.2016 | DK | 14.09.2016 | EE | 14.09.2016 | FI | 14.09.2016 | HR | 14.09.2016 | LT | 14.09.2016 | LV | 14.09.2016 | MC | 14.09.2016 | MK | 14.09.2016 | MT | 14.09.2016 | SI | 14.09.2016 | SM | 14.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | IE | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | BG | 14.12.2016 | NO | 14.12.2016 | GR | 15.12.2016 | IS | 14.01.2017 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.09.2009 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
IE | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
IE | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
IE | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 14.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2616908 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [X] 1-3 * page 4, line 15 - page 7, line 35 *; | [I]EP0844075 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [I] 6-8 * column 6, line 48 - column 7, line 45 *; | [I]US6432522 (FRIEDMAN MICHAEL [US], et al) [I] 4-8 * column 5, line 40 - line 48; figures 1,2; example 4; tables 1,2,6 *; | [A]WO03053688 (ATOFINA [FR], et al) [A] 1 * page 9, line 6 - page 10, line 4; figure 1 *; | [L]FR2875182 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]) [L] 1-3* page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 2 *; | [X]WO2007135317 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR], et al) [X] 6-8 * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 7 * * page 12, line 5 - line 12; claim - * |