EP2364212 - CARBONYLATION PROCESS USING BOUND SILVER AND/OR COPPER MORDENITE CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BP Chemicals Limited Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7BP / GB | [2011/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DITZEL, Evert, Jan 46 Boothgate Drive Howden Goole East Yorkshire DN14 7EW / GB | 02 /
LAW, David, John 36 Warwick Drive Beverley East Yorkshire HU17 9TB / GB | 03 /
SUNLEY, John, Glenn 7 Hall Walk Cottingham East Yorkshire HU16 4RL / GB | [2011/37] | Representative(s) | Brooke, Caron, et al BP International Limited Patents & Agreements Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | [2014/08] |
Former [2011/37] | Brooke, Caron BP International Limited Global Patents & Technology Law (Central) Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 09752453.2 | 16.11.2009 | WO2009GB02673 | Priority number, date | EP20080253942 | 10.12.2008 Original published format: EP 08253942 | [2011/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010067043 | Date: | 17.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2364212 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/20, B01J29/24, B01J37/00, B01J37/04, C07C51/12, C07C67/37, C07C53/08, C07C69/14 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
C07C51/12 (EP,KR,US);
B01J29/22 (EP,KR,US);
B01J29/24 (EP,US);
B01J35/612 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/613 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/615 (EP,US);
B01J37/0009 (EP,KR,US);
B01J37/0201 (EP,US);
C07C67/37 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2229/42 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/12, C07C53/08 (EP,US);
C07C67/37, C07C69/14 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | RS | 23.05.2011 | Title | German: | CARBONYLIERUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON GEBUNDENEN SILBER- UND/ODER KUPFERMORDENIT-KATALYSATOREN | [2011/37] | English: | CARBONYLATION PROCESS USING BOUND SILVER AND/OR COPPER MORDENITE CATALYSTS | [2011/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CARBONYLATION UTILISANT DES CATALYSEURS DE MORDÉNITE AVEC DE L ARGENT ET/OU DU CUIVRE LIÉ | [2011/37] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 06.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 28.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/48] | 26.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH11147042 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-14 * abstract ** paragraphs [0007] , [0010] , [0011] , [0020] , [0023] , [0033] *; | [I]WO2007128955 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * page 3, line 4 - page 6, line 22 * * examples 1-6 * * tables 1,2 *; | [IP]EP2000433 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [IP] 1-14 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0047] * * table 2 *; | [I] - ELLIS B ET AL, "Heterogeneous catalysts for the direct, halide-free carbonylation of methanol", 11TH INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS ON CATALYSIS - 40TH ANNIVERSARY. ICC '96, AMSTERDAM : ELSEVIER.; NL, (19960630), vol. 101, no. Part B, ISBN 978-0-444-81947-5, pages 771 - 779, XP009101682 [I] 1-14 * abstract * * par. 2: "Catalyst preparation and experimental" * * par. 3. "Catalyst performance" * * figure 1a * | Examination | WO2007116201 |