EP2364339 - ABRASIVE GRAINS HAVING UNIQUE FEATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diamond Innovations, Inc. PO Box 568 Worthington, OH 43085 / US | [2011/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Kai 8029 Lazelle Woods Drive Westerville OH 43081 / US | 02 /
PAKALAPATI, Rajeev 4136 Via Andorra Appartment D Santa Barbara California 93110 / US | 03 /
LUCEK, John, W. 2660 Quail Crossing Drive Powell OH 43065 / US | [2011/41] |
Former [2011/37] | 01 /
ZHANG, Kai 8029 Lazelle Woods Drive Westerville OH 43081 / US | ||
02 /
PAKALAPATI, Rajeev 1069 Kirk Avenue Worthington OH 43085 / US | |||
03 /
LUCEK, John, W. 2660 Quail Crossing Drive Powell OH 43065 / US | Representative(s) | Neilson, Martin Mark, et al Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Studio 3 84 Albion Street Leeds LS1 6AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Hammarsjö, Joakim Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | Application number, filing date | 09752543.0 | 16.09.2009 | WO2009US57110 | Priority number, date | US20080097527P | 16.09.2008 Original published format: US 97527 P | [2011/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010033559 | Date: | 25.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2364339 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/14, C04B35/5831 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
C04B35/62821 (EP,CN,US);
C09K3/14 (KR);
C09K3/1409 (EP,CN,US);
C01B21/064 (KR);
C04B35/5831 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C04B35/62802 (CN);
C04B35/62807 (EP,CN,US);
C04B35/62813 (EP,CN,US);
C04B35/62823 (EP,CN,US);
C04B35/62831 (EP,CN,US);
C04B35/62834 (EP,CN,US);
C04B35/62842 (CN);
C04B35/645 (KR);
C09K3/1436 (EP,CN,US);
C04B2235/386 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHLEIFKÖRNER MIT EINZIGARTIGEN MERKMALEN | [2011/37] | English: | ABRASIVE GRAINS HAVING UNIQUE FEATURES | [2011/37] | French: | GRAINS ABRASIFS POSSÉDANT DES MOTIFS UNIQUES | [2011/37] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 01.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 07.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.01.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | EP19217610.5 / EP3660121 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US2947617 (WENTORF JR ROBERT H); | [A]WO9851419 (TOTH RICHARD EDMUND [US]); | [XI]WO2005019371 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al); | [XI]US2005220690 (OHTSUBO HIROHIKO [JP]) |