EP2370173 - INTERFERENCE MITIGATION FOR IMPLANTABLE DEVICE RECHARGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [2011/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAUSE, Paul, G. 5946 Royal Oaks Drive Shoreview MN 55126 / US | 02 /
DONOFRIO, William, T. 15608 Avocet Street Northwest Andover MN 55304 / US | 03 /
ARNE, Gerald, P. 940 Dakota Avenue Long Lake MN 55356 / US | 04 /
REINKE, James, D. 7731 Ranchview Lane Maple Grove MN 55311 / US | 05 /
PEICHEL, David, J. 4217 Garfield Avenue Minneaplis MN 55409 / US | 06 /
DAVIS, Timothy 3764 115th Avenue Nw Coon Rapids MN 55433 / US | 07 /
BURNES, John, E. 12823 Bluebird Street Nw Coon Rapids MN 55448 / US | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09753272.5 | 30.10.2009 | WO2009US62833 | Priority number, date | US20080110131P | 31.10.2008 Original published format: US 110131 P | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010051482 | Date: | 06.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2370173 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/378, A61N1/372, A61N1/37, H02J7/02 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
A61N1/3787 (EP,US);
A61N1/37288 (EP,US);
A61N1/3704 (EP,US);
A61N1/3718 (EP,US);
A61N1/37264 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MINDERUNG VON INTERFERENZ ZUM AUFLADEN VON IMPLANTIERBAREN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2011/40] | English: | INTERFERENCE MITIGATION FOR IMPLANTABLE DEVICE RECHARGING | [2011/40] | French: | MITIGATION DES INTERFÉRENCES POUR REMISE EN CHARGE DE DISPOSITIFS IMPLANTABLES | [2011/40] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 11.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/29] | 27.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2003045906 (STROEBEL JOHN C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,11 * figures 1,2,4 * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0061] * [A] 4; | [XP]WO2009055579 (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-3,11 * figures 11A, 11B, 13-18 * * page 13, line 24 - page 35, line 3 *; | [A]US2003078634 (SCHULMAN JOSEPH H [US], et al) [A] 1-4,11 * the whole document *; | [A] - BUDGETT DAVID M ET AL, "Novel technology for the provision of power to implantable physiological devices.", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSIOLOGY, BETHESDA, MD., (200704), vol. 102, no. 4, ISSN 8750-7587, pages 1658 - 1663, XP002591889 [A] 1-4,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/JAPPLPHYSIOL.00105.2006 | by applicant | US2003045906 |