EP2339030 - SCREENING METHOD FOR LIVER X RECEPTOR AGONISTS AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Golden Biotechnology Corporation 15F, No.27-6, Sec.2 Jhong-Jheng E.Rd. Danshuei Township Taipei Hsien Taiwan / CN | [2011/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Sheng-Yung 15F No.27-6 Sec.2 Jhong-Jheng E.Road. Danshuei Township Taipei County 25170 Taiwan / CN | 02 /
WEN, Wu-Che 15F No.27-6 Sec.2 Jhong-Jheng E.Road. Danshuei Township Taipei County 25170 Taiwan / CN | 03 /
KUO, Mao-Tien 15F No.27-6 Sec.2 Jhong-Jheng E.Road. Danshuei Township Taipei County 25170 Taiwan / CN | [2012/04] |
Former [2011/26] | 01 /
LIU, Sheng-Yun 15F No.27-6 Sec.2 Jhong-Jheng E.Road. Danshuei Township Taipei County 25170 Taiwan / CN | ||
02 /
WEN, Wu-Che 15F No.27-6 Sec.2 Jhong-Jheng E.Road. Danshuei Township Taipei County 25170 Taiwan / CN | |||
03 /
KUO, Mao-Tien 15F No.27-6 Sec.2 Jhong-Jheng E.Road. Danshuei Township Taipei County 25170 Taiwan / CN | Representative(s) | Cole, William Gwyn, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | Cole, William Gwyn, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09753423.4 | 26.05.2009 | [2011/26] | WO2009CN00587 | Priority number, date | CN20081109808 | 30.05.2008 Original published format: CN200810109808 | [2011/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009143705 | Date: | 03.12.2009 | Language: | ZH | [2009/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2339030 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12N15/09, G01N33/50, B01D11/00, A61K36/29 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
G01N33/6875 (EP);
A61K36/71 (EP);
C12Q1/6897 (EP);
C07K2319/715 (EP);
C07K2319/80 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6897, C12Q2522/101 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/26] | Title | German: | SCREENING-VERFAHREN FÜR LEBER-X-REZEPTORAGONISTEN UND ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2011/26] | English: | SCREENING METHOD FOR LIVER X RECEPTOR AGONISTS AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2011/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CRIBLAGE POUR DES ANTAGONISTES DES RÉCEPTEURS HÉPATIQUES X ET SON APPLICATION | [2011/26] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2011 | Translation filed | 14.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 14.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.07.2014 | 01.07.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/02] | 25.07.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.09.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 26.09.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.10.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 14.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.06.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 14.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.04.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 14.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.04.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 14.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.04.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 14.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.04.2011 | Decision despatched | 14.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.04.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - JIAN-XIN LI ET AL, "Cimicifugae Rhizoma: From Origins, Bioactive Constituents to Clinical Outcomes", CURRENT MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, BE, (20060101), vol. 13, ISSN 0929-8673, pages 2927 - 2951, XP007919386 [X] 1-9 * pp.2927, 2940 col.1, 2943 col.1, 2946 col.1; tables 1-2. * | [X] - MINGHUA QIU ET AL, "Anticomplement Activity of Cycloartane Glycosides from the Rhizome of Cimicifuga foetida", PHYTOTHERAPY RESEARCH, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD. CHICHESTER, GB, vol. 20, doi:10.1002/PTR.1982, ISSN 0951-418X, (20060101), pages 945 - 948, (20060814), XP007919385 [X] 1-5 * materials and methods * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ptr.1982 | [X] - YONG LIU ET AL, "Two New Cyclolanostanol Xylosides from the Aerial Parts of Cimicifuga dahurica", JOURNAL OF NATURAL PRODUCTS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 65, doi:10.1021/NP020130G, ISSN 0163-3864, (20020101), pages 1486 - 1488, (20020812), XP007919388 [X] 1-3,5,6 * materials and methods * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/np020130g | [X] - KIM J-K ET AL, "Hepatoprotective activity of Chungpesagan-tang is related to the inhibition of [beta]-glucuronidase", NATURAL PRODUCT SCIENCES, KOREAN SOCIETY OF PHARMACOGNOSY, SEOUL, KR, (20010101), vol. 7, no. 3, ISSN 1226-3907, pages 63 - 67, XP009151945 [X] 1-3,8,9 * introduction; materials and methods * | [X] - QING-WEN ZHANG ET AL, "Cycloartane Glycosides from Cimicifuga dahurica", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, TOKYO, JP, (20010101), vol. 49, no. 11, ISSN 0009-2363, pages 1468 - 1470, XP007919387 [X] 1-3,5,6 * p.1468 par.2 * | International search | [X]CN1980919 (IRM LLC); | [A]WO02090375 (ARCH DEV CORP ET AL.) | Examination | CN1475269 | CN1730448 | - LIAO J F ET AL, "Evaluation with receptor binding assay on the water extracts of ten CNS-active Chinese herbal drugs", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL SCIENCE COUNCIL. REPUBLIC OFCHINA. PART B. LIFE SCIENCES, NATIONAL SCIENCE COUNCIL, TAIPEI, TW, (19950701), vol. 19, no. 3, ISSN 0255-6596, pages 151 - 158, XP009151949 | - CAO PEI ET AL, "Chemical constituents from Cimicifuga foetida", JOURNAL OF ASIAN NATURAL PRODUCTS RESEARCH, GORDON AND BREACH, CHUR, CH, (20050401), vol. 7, no. 2, doi:10.1080/1028602042000204081, ISSN 1028-6020, pages 145 - 149, XP009151970 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/1028602042000204081 | - TIAN ZE ET AL, "Antitumor activity and mechanisms of action of total glycosides from aerial part of Cimicifuga dahurica targeted against hepatoma", BMC CANCER, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20071231), vol. 7, no. 1, ISSN 1471-2407, page 237, XP021034525 | - Appendino C ET AL, "New Cycloartane Glycosides from Cimicifuga dahurica", Nat. Prod. Rep. j. Nat. Prod. Chem. Common. Chem. Commun, (19990101), pages 1130 - 11331561, URL: https://www.thieme-connect.com/ejournals/pdf/10.1055/s-2006-960865.pdf, XP055095323 | - J. Plat, "Plant sterols and stanols: effects on mixed micellar composition and LXR (target gene) activation", The Journal of Lipid Research, (20050908), vol. 46, no. 11, doi:10.1194/jlr.M500272-JLR200, ISSN 0022-2275, pages 2468 - 2476, XP055095183 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1194/jlr.M500272-JLR200 | - Hiranthi Jayasuriya ET AL, "Diterpenoid, Steroid, and Triterpenoid Agonists of Liver X Receptors from Diversified Terrestrial Plants and Marine Sources", Journal of Natural Products, (20050801), vol. 68, no. 8, doi:10.1021/np050182g, ISSN 0163-3864, pages 1247 - 1252, XP055095184 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/np050182g | by applicant | - WILLY, P. J., UMESONO, K., ONG, E. S., EVANS, R. M., HEYMAN, R. A., MANGELSDORF, D. J., "LXR, a nuclear receptor that defines a distinct retinoid response pathway", GENES DEV., (1995), vol. 9, no. 9, pages 1033 - 45 | - STEFFENSEN, K.R., GUSTAFSSON, J.A., "Putative metabolic effects of the liver X receptor (LXR)", DIABETES, (2004), vol. 53, no. 1, pages 36 - 42 | - PROCTOR, G., JIANG, T., IWAHASHI, M., WANG, Z., LI, J., LEVI, M., "Regulation of renal fatty acid and cholesterol metabolism, inflammation, and fibrosis in Akita and OVE26 mice with type 1 diabetes", DIABETES, (2006), vol. 55, no. 9, pages 2502 - 9 | - KOLDAMOVA, R. P., LEFTEROV, I. M., STAUFENBIEL, M., WOLFE, D., HUANG, S., GLORIOSO, J. C., WALTER, M., ROTH, M. G., LAZO, J. S., "The liver X receptor ligand T0901317 decreases amyloid beta production in vitro and in a mouse model of Alzheimer's disease", J BIOL CHEM. 11, (2005), vol. 280, no. 6, pages 4079 - 88 | - FUKUCHI, J., KOKONTIS, J. M., HIIPAKKA, R.A., CHUU, C.P., LIAO, S., "Antiproliferative effect of liver X receptor agonists on LNCaP human prostate cancer cells", CANCER RES., (20041101), vol. 64, no. 21, pages 7686 - 9 |