EP2307703 - BLADE FOR A ROTOR OF A WIND OR WATER TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vindtek Tórshavn ApS Adelgade 7 8400 Ebeltoft / DK | [2011/18] |
Former [2011/15] | For all designated states FO900 Invest APS Gammel Havn 1 8700 Horsens / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARSEN, Helgi Aboulevarden 52, 3 sal DK-8700 Horsens / DK | 02 /
MÜLLER, Jan, Allan Fjordparken 386 DK-8700 Horsens / DK | 03 /
LARSEN, Lars Aaboulevarden 52, 3. tv. DK-8700 Horsens / DK | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | Nielsen, Leif, et al Patrade A/S Ceresbyen 75 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2011/15] | Nielsen, Leif, et al Patrade A/S Fredens Torv 3A 8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 09753559.5 | 27.05.2009 | [2011/15] | WO2009DK00117 | Priority number, date | DK20080000723 | 27.05.2008 Original published format: DK 200800723 | [2011/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009143846 | Date: | 03.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2307703 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XN | 03.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F03B3/12, F03D1/06 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
F03B3/121 (EP,US);
F03D1/0641 (EP,US);
F05B2240/302 (EP,US);
F05B2250/323 (EP,US);
Y02E10/20 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/15] | Title | German: | FLÜGEL FÜR EINEN ROTOR EINER WIND- ODER WASSERTURBINE | [2011/15] | English: | BLADE FOR A ROTOR OF A WIND OR WATER TURBINE | [2011/15] | French: | PALE POUR UN ROTOR D'EOLIENNE OU DE TURBINE A EAU | [2011/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 30.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/33] | 30.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/15] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/38] | 13.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/51] | 11.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/51] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 02.03.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 02.03.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.03.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 02.03.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 02.03.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.03.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 02.03.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 02.03.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.03.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 02.03.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 02.03.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.03.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1553627 (FORREST NAGLER) [X] 1-10 * page 1, line 8 - line 14 * * page 2, line 49 - page 3, line 28 * * figure - *; | [X]US2622686 (MARIE CHEVREAU RENE LOUIS PIER, et al) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 2 * * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 27 * * figures 3-6 *; | [E]WO2009146810 (MICKELER SIEGFRIED [DE]) [E] 1-3,8-10 * page 7, line 26 - page 11, line 7 * * page 13, line 20 - line 33 * * abstract *; | [XI]EP0064742 (FICHT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6,8-10 * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 7 * * abstract * [I] 7; | [X]US5002001 (SPRANGER GUENTER [DE]) [X] 1-3,7-10 * column 2, line 36 - column 5, line 50 * * abstract * | International search | [X]US1553627 (FORREST NAGLER); | [X]US4687416 (SPRANGER GUENTHER [DE]); | [X]EP0282830 (SPRANGER GUNTER); | [X]WO2007105174 (TECSIS TECNOLOGIA E SISTEMAS AVANCADOS SA [BR], et al); | [X]DE3724701 (ZEIDES OTTO [DE]) |