EP2285560 - METALLIC HONEYCOMB BODY WITH DEFINED CONNECTING POINTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emitec Gesellschaft für Emissionstechnologie mbH Hauptstrasse 128 53797 Lohmar / DE | [2011/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAUS, Wolfgang Gut Horst 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02 /
BRÜCK, Rolf Fröbelstrasse 12 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 03 /
HIRTH, Peter Birkenweg 56 51503 Rösrath / DE | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | Rössler, Matthias, et al KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Rössler, Matthias, et al KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 09753788.0 | 11.05.2009 | [2011/08] | WO2009EP55680 | Priority number, date | DE20081025593 | 28.05.2008 Original published format: DE102008025593 | [2011/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009144133 | Date: | 03.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2285560 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2285560 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B32B3/12, F01N3/28 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
F01N3/281 (EP,US);
F01N2260/10 (EP,US);
F01N2330/04 (EP,US);
F01N2330/321 (EP,US);
F01N2330/325 (EP,US);
F01N2330/44 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/08] | Title | German: | METALLISCHER WABENKÖRPER MIT DEFINIERTEN VERBINDUNGSSTELLEN | [2011/08] | English: | METALLIC HONEYCOMB BODY WITH DEFINED CONNECTING POINTS | [2011/08] | French: | CORPS ALVÉOLAIRE MÉTALLIQUE COMPORTANT DES POINTS DE JONCTION DÉFINIS | [2011/08] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 23.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.05.2009 | CY | 28.03.2012 | CZ | 28.03.2012 | EE | 28.03.2012 | FI | 28.03.2012 | HR | 28.03.2012 | LT | 28.03.2012 | LV | 28.03.2012 | MK | 28.03.2012 | MT | 28.03.2012 | NL | 28.03.2012 | RO | 28.03.2012 | SI | 28.03.2012 | SK | 28.03.2012 | TR | 28.03.2012 | IE | 11.05.2012 | LU | 11.05.2012 | BE | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | BG | 28.06.2012 | NO | 28.06.2012 | GR | 29.06.2012 | IS | 28.07.2012 | PT | 30.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MK | 28.03.2012 | ||
MT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IE | 11.05.2012 | ||
LU | 11.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MK | 28.03.2012 | ||
MT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
IE | 11.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MK | 28.03.2012 | ||
MT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
IE | 11.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
IE | 11.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
IE | 11.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 28.03.2012 | |
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 28.03.2012 | |
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 28.03.2012 | |
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NO | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 28.03.2012 | |
NO | 28.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3312944 (INTERATOM [DE]) [X] 1-10 * abstract ** page 10, lines 7-12 * |