EP2284262 - PRIMER AND PROBE FOR DETECTION OF MYCOBACTERIUM INTRACELLULARE, AND METHOD FOR DETECTION OF MYCOBACTERIUM INTRACELLULARE USING THE PRIMER OR THE PROBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wako Pure Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-2, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-8605 / JP | [2011/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIKAWA Tomokazu 6-1 Takada-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661-0963 / JP | [2011/07] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 09754689.9 | 26.05.2009 | [2011/07] | WO2009JP59593 | Priority number, date | JP20080139105 | 28.05.2008 Original published format: JP 2008139105 | [2011/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009145181 | Date: | 03.12.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2284262 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12Q1/04, C12Q1/68, G01N33/569 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
G01N33/5695 (EP,US);
C12Q1/689 (EP,US);
G01N2333/35 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/07] | Title | German: | PRIMER UND SONDE FÜR DEN NACHWEIS VON MYCOBACTERIUM INTRACELLULARE UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEN NACHWEIS VON MYCOBACTERIUM INTRACELLULARE MIT DEM PRIMER ODER DER SONDE | [2011/07] | English: | PRIMER AND PROBE FOR DETECTION OF MYCOBACTERIUM INTRACELLULARE, AND METHOD FOR DETECTION OF MYCOBACTERIUM INTRACELLULARE USING THE PRIMER OR THE PROBE | [2011/07] | French: | AMORCE ET SONDE POUR LA DÉTECTION DE MYCOBACTERIUM INTRACELLULARE, ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA DÉTECTION DE MYCOBACTERIUM INTRACELLULARE À L'AIDE DE L'AMORCE OU DE LA SONDE | [2011/07] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2010 | Translation filed | 12.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 20.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/29] | 13.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/29] | Divisional application(s) | EP14191337.6 / EP2853594 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - SAITO H ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION OF VARIOUS SEROVAR STRAINS OF MYCOBACTERIUM AVIUM COMPLEX BY USING DNA PROBES SPECIFIC FOR MYCOBACTERIUM AVIUM AND MYCOBACTERIUM INTRACELLULARE", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19900801), vol. 28, no. 8, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 1694 - 1697, XP000675401 [I] 1-15 * abstract * | [I] - YAMAMOTO T ET AL, "Polymerase chain reaction for the differentiation of Mycobacterium intracellulare and Mycobacterium avium", TUBERCLE AND LUNG DISEASE, CHURCHILL LIVINGSTONE MEDICAL JOURNALS, EDINBURGH, GB, vol. 74, no. 5, doi:10.1016/0962-8479(93)90110-J, ISSN 0962-8479, (19931001), pages 342 - 345, (19931001), XP023044782 [I] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0962-8479(93)90110-J | [I] - YAMAZAKI T ET AL, "Identification of Mycobacterium intracellulare by a polymerase chain reaction using species-specific primers", TUBERCLE AND LUNG DISEASE, CHURCHILL LIVINGSTONE MEDICAL JOURNALS, EDINBURGH, GB, (19950801), vol. 76, no. 4, ISSN 0962-8479, pages 330 - 335, XP004979840 [I] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - "WLB141G08.ab1 WLtestis Gallus gallus cDNA 5', mRNA sequence.", EMBL, (20040410), Database accession no. CN237871, URL: EBI, XP002664526 [A] 1-15 * sequence . * | International search | [Y]WO2007129628 (WAKO PURE CHEM IND LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2006029014 (UNIV COLORADO [US], et al); | [Y]JP2003284565 (TOSOH CORP); | [Y]JPH10323189 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [Y]JP2005204582 (ASAHI KASEI CORP) | [Y] - DE BEENHOUWER H. ET AL., "Detection and Identification of Mycobacteria by DNA Amplification and Oligonucleotide-Specific Capture Plate Hybridization.", J.CLIN.MICROBIOL., (1995), vol. 33, no. 11, pages 2994 - 2998, XP002287320 | by applicant | JPH104984 | JP2001103986 | JP2007059251 | JPH1169999 | JP3111213B | JP2005204582 | WO2007129628 | JPH11155589 | JPS60500717 | JPH04211399 | JPH0819394 | US5210015 | US5538848 | US5801155 | US5925517 | US6492121 | JP2650159B | JPH07114718B | JPH02500565 | WO8810315 | JPH1146778 | JPS62265999 | JPS5840099 | - F. POLY ET AL., J. BACTERIOLOGY, (2004), vol. 186, no. 14, pages 4781 - 4795 | - FEMS MICROBIOLOGY LETTERS, (1998), vol. 166, pages 63 - 70 | - SYSTEMATIC AND APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, (2001), vol. 24, pages 109 - 112 | - VENTER ET AL., SCIENCE, (20010216), vol. 291, no. 5507, pages 1304 - 1351 | - D. M. MORRISON'S METHOD (METHOD IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1979), vol. 68, pages 326 - 331 | - KENT PT; KUBICA GP, Pubric Health Mycobacteriology, A Guide for the Level III Laboratory, U.S.DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICE, (1985), pages 31 - 55 | - R. BOOM; C. J. A. SOL; M. M. M. SALIMANS; C. L. JANSEN; P. M. E. WERTHEIM-VAN DILLEN; J. VAN DER NOORDAA, "Rapid and simple method for purification of nucleic acids", J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (199003), vol. 28, no. 3, pages 495 - 503 | - TSUGUNORI NOTOMI ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., vol. 28, page 2000 | - RINSHO BYORI, CLINICAL PATHOLOGY, (200311), vol. 51, no. 11, pages 1061 - 1067 | - VENTER, SCIENCE, (20010216), vol. 291, no. 5507, pages 1304 - 1351 |