EP2296845 - BROACHING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gardner, James Joseph 700 East 5th Avenue Lancaster, OH 43130 / US | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | London IP Ltd 100 High street Milford on Sea Lymington, Hampshire SO41 0QE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | London IP Ltd 2 Cobble Mews Mountgrove Road London N5 2LN / GB | ||
Former [2011/12] | Warrilow, David Thomas London IP Ltd 2 Cobble Mews Mountgrove Road GB-London N5 2LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 09755822.5 | 01.06.2009 | [2011/12] | WO2009US45873 | Priority number, date | US20080130427 | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 130427 | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009146462 | Date: | 03.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2296845 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B23P15/42 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
B23D13/00 (EP,US);
B23B27/1603 (EP,US);
B23B29/04 (EP,US);
B23B2200/0447 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1628 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1657 (EP,US);
Y10T407/23 (EP,US);
Y10T409/501476 (EP,US);
Y10T409/502624 (EP,US);
Y10T409/509348 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/12] | Title | German: | RÄUMWERKZEUG | [2011/12] | English: | BROACHING TOOL | [2011/12] | French: | OUTIL DE BROCHAGE | [2011/12] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 30.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 02.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/21] | 06.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.2011 | 30.06.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4509886 (LINDSAY HAROLD W [US]); | [A]US4890961 (CARL HANS-GEORG [DE], et al); | [A]US6758637 (GATI UZI [IL]); | [A]US3760474 (STEIN W) | [X] - KORN., "Indexable-Insert Broaching Tool Technology For Lathes.", MMS ONLINE., (20070801), URL: http://wwwmmsonline.com/articles/indexable-insert-broaching-tool-technology-for-lathes.aspx, (20090715), XP008139148 |