EP2344937 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING THE AUTOMATIC LANDING/TAKE-OFF OF A DRONE ON OR FROM A CIRCULAR LANDING GRID OF A PLATFORM, IN PARTICULAR A NAVAL PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DCNS 40-42 rue du Docteur Finlay 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/29] | For all designated states DCNS 40-42, rue du Docteur Finlay 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORESVE, Julien Pierre Guillaume Rue Lavoisier, 21 F/-29480 Le Relecq-kerhuon / FR | [2012/03] |
Former [2011/48] | 01 /
MORESVE, Julien Pierre Guillaume Rue Lavoisier, 21 29480 Le Relecq-kerhuon / FR | ||
Former [2011/29] | 01 /
MORESVE, Julien Pierre Guillaume 21 rue Lavoisier F-29480 Le Relecq-kerhuon / FR | Representative(s) | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/50] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2011/29] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09756015.5 | 13.10.2009 | [2011/29] | WO2009FR51948 | Priority number, date | FR20080056927 | 13.10.2008 Original published format: FR 0856927 | [2011/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010043812 | Date: | 22.04.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2344937 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2344937 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/06 | [2011/29] | CPC: |
G05D1/0684 (EP,US);
G05D1/0653 (KR);
B64C39/024 (KR);
G05D1/12 (KR);
B64U2201/20 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM STEUERN DES AUTOMATISCHEN LANDENS/STARTENS EINER DRONE AUF ODER VON EINEM KREISFÖRMIGEN LANDEGITTER EINER PLATTFORM, INSBESONDERE EINER SEEPLATTFORM | [2011/29] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING THE AUTOMATIC LANDING/TAKE-OFF OF A DRONE ON OR FROM A CIRCULAR LANDING GRID OF A PLATFORM, IN PARTICULAR A NAVAL PLATFORM | [2011/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE CONTRÔLE DE L'APPONTAGE/DÉCOLLAGE AUTOMATIQUE D'UN DRONE SUR OU D'UNE GRILLE CIRCULAIRE D'APPONTAGE D'UNE PLATE-FORME NOTAMMENT NAVALE | [2011/29] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 02.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.10.2009 | AT | 12.12.2012 | CY | 12.12.2012 | CZ | 12.12.2012 | EE | 12.12.2012 | FI | 12.12.2012 | HR | 12.12.2012 | LT | 12.12.2012 | LV | 12.12.2012 | MC | 12.12.2012 | MK | 12.12.2012 | MT | 12.12.2012 | PL | 12.12.2012 | RO | 12.12.2012 | SI | 12.12.2012 | SK | 12.12.2012 | SM | 12.12.2012 | BG | 12.03.2013 | NO | 12.03.2013 | IS | 12.04.2013 | PT | 12.04.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 13.10.2009 | |
AT | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
MK | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
SM | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
MK | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
SM | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
SM | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 12.12.2012 | |
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 12.12.2012 | |
NO | 12.03.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2727082 (CHAUTHAI LUC [FR]) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]US2005033489 (TEZUKA SYUNSUKE [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * |