EP2362760 - INTRODUCER FOR DEPLOYING A STENT GRAFT IN A CURVED LUMEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cook Medical Technologies LLC 750 North Daniels Way Bloomington, IN 47404 / US | [2020/28] |
Former [2012/10] | For all designated states Cook Medical Technologies LLC 750 North Daniels Way Bloomington, IN 47404 / US | ||
Former [2012/05] | For all designated states William Cook Europe ApS Sandet 6 4632 Bjaeverskov / DK | ||
For all designated states Cook Medical Technologies LLC 750 North Daniels Way Bloomington, IN 47404 / US | |||
Former [2011/36] | For all designated states William Cook Europe ApS Sandet 6 4632 Bjaeverskov / DK | ||
For all designated states Cook Incorporated 750 N. Daniels Way Bloomington, IN 47404 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RASMUSSEN, Erik, E. Vesterhaven 1 Slagelse 4200 / DK | 02 /
ØHLENSCHLAEGER, Bent Ejbyvej 43 B Li, Skensved 4623 / DK | 03 /
JENSEN, Kim, Moegelvang Straussvej 4, 2.mf Koebenhavn SV, 2450 / DK | [2011/36] | Representative(s) | Ellis, Katherine Elizabeth Sleigh Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings London, WC1V 7QH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Ellis, Katherine Elizabeth Sleigh Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings London, WC1V 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 09756071.8 | 30.10.2009 | [2020/28] | WO2009US05912 | Priority number, date | GB20080020066 | 31.10.2008 Original published format: GB 0820066 | [2011/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010062362 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2362760 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2362760 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/07, A61F2/95 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
A61F2/07 (EP,US);
A61F2/95 (EP,US);
A61F2/9517 (EP,US);
A61F2/89 (EP,US);
A61F2002/075 (EP,US);
A61F2002/828 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/36] | A61F2/06, A61F2/84 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINFÜHRINSTRUMENT ZUR ABLAGE EINER STENT-GRAFT-PROTHESE IN EINEM GEBOGENEN LUMEN | [2011/36] | English: | INTRODUCER FOR DEPLOYING A STENT GRAFT IN A CURVED LUMEN | [2011/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF INTRODUCTEUR POUR DÉPLOYER UNE ENDOPROTHÈSE DANS UNE LUMIÈRE COURBE | [2011/36] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/36] | 21.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2016 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 22.09.2016 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 24.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2019 | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2009 | AT | 08.07.2020 | CY | 08.07.2020 | CZ | 08.07.2020 | DK | 08.07.2020 | EE | 08.07.2020 | ES | 08.07.2020 | FI | 08.07.2020 | HR | 08.07.2020 | IT | 08.07.2020 | LT | 08.07.2020 | LV | 08.07.2020 | MC | 08.07.2020 | MK | 08.07.2020 | MT | 08.07.2020 | NL | 08.07.2020 | PL | 08.07.2020 | RO | 08.07.2020 | SE | 08.07.2020 | SI | 08.07.2020 | SK | 08.07.2020 | SM | 08.07.2020 | TR | 08.07.2020 | BG | 08.10.2020 | NO | 08.10.2020 | GR | 09.10.2020 | LU | 30.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | FR | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | IS | 08.11.2020 | PT | 09.11.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.10.2009 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CY | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
MT | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
TR | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
TR | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 08.07.2020 | |
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 08.07.2020 | |
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO03034948 (COOK INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-7,12-22* column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 6; figures 4,6 *; | [X]WO2008051543 (COOK INCORPORTED [US], et al) [X] 1-7,12-22 * page 14, column 16, line 22 - page 16, line 32; figures 12-17 * | by applicant | US2004073289 | US6974471 | US7279003 | US7318835 | WO2008051543 |