EP2337822 - LONG-TERM STABLE MICROBICIDE AND COATING FOR PREVENTING BIOFILM FORMATION AND COATING COMPOSITION THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EPG (Engineered nanoProducts Germany) AG Goethestrasse 30 64347 Griesheim / DE | [2019/51] |
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states EPG (Engineered nanoProducts Germany) AG Goethestrasse 30 64347 Griesheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENDRES, Klaus Emilienstr. 26 66424 Homburg / DE | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Helmut Im Königsfeld 29 66130 Saarbrücken-Güdingen / DE | [2011/26] | Representative(s) | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [2019/51] |
Former [2013/36] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/26] | Barz, Peter Meissner Bolte Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09756449.6 | 13.10.2009 | [2011/26] | WO2009EP63325 | Priority number, date | DE20081051543 | 14.10.2008 Original published format: DE102008051543 | [2011/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010043606 | Date: | 22.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2337822 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2337822 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C09D4/00, C09D183/04, C09D183/06, C09D183/14, A61K31/00, A61L27/50, A61L29/08 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
C09D183/04 (EP);
C09D183/06 (EP);
C09D183/14 (EP);
C09D4/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08G77/14 (EP);
C09D4/00, C08G77/20 (EP);
C09D4/00, C08G77/56 (EP);
C09D4/00, C08G77/58 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] |
Former [2011/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LANGZEITSTABILE, MIKROBIZIDE UND DIE BIOFILMBILDUNG VERHINDERNDE BESCHICHTUNG UND BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG DAFÜR | [2011/26] | English: | LONG-TERM STABLE MICROBICIDE AND COATING FOR PREVENTING BIOFILM FORMATION AND COATING COMPOSITION THEREFOR | [2011/26] | French: | MICROBICIDES STABLES À LONG TERME ET FORMATION D'UN REVÊTEMENT ÉVITANT LA FORMATION D'UN BIOFILM ET COMPOSITION DE REVÊTEMENT UTILISÉE A CET EFFET | [2011/26] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 15.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.01.2019 | 04.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.10.2009 | CY | 18.12.2019 | CZ | 18.12.2019 | EE | 18.12.2019 | FI | 18.12.2019 | HR | 18.12.2019 | LT | 18.12.2019 | LV | 18.12.2019 | MC | 18.12.2019 | MK | 18.12.2019 | MT | 18.12.2019 | RO | 18.12.2019 | SI | 18.12.2019 | SK | 18.12.2019 | SM | 18.12.2019 | BG | 18.03.2020 | GR | 19.03.2020 | IS | 18.04.2020 | PT | 13.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 13.10.2009 | |
CY | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
MT | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19935230 (FEINCHEMIE GMBH SEBNITZ [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-13 * pages 4-5; example 1; claim 15 *; | [X]US4563351 (CASLAVSKY VERA B [US], et al) [X] 1-10,13 * columns 3,5-8; example 9 *; | [X]DE102005000905 (SENSIENT IMAGING TECHNOLOGIES [DE]) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0008] - [0012]; examples 4,7 *; | [X]US2003044451 (MCGHEE DIANE [US], et al) [X] 1,10,13 * example 1; claims 1-45 *; | [A]DE10159288 (NANO X GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * example 1 *; | [A]WO0236701 (INST NEUE MAT GEMEIN GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * examples 1-2 * * abstract * | Examination | US2007154621 | DE10159288 | WO0236701 |