EP2358836 - CREPING ADHESIVES WITH IMPROVED FILM PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nalco Company 1601 West Diehl Road Naperville, IL 60563-1198 / US | [2017/40] |
Former [2011/34] | For all designated states Nalco Company 1601 West Diehl Road Naperville, IL 60563-1198 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIGORIEV, Vladimir, A. 959 Rupley Drive N.E. Atlanta Georgia 30306 / US | 02 /
FURMAN, Gary, S. 108 South 12th Street St. Charles Illinois 60174 / US | 03 /
WEI, Mingli 2016 Chang Court Naperville Illinois 60540 / US | 04 /
SU, Winston 338 Meadow Green Drive Naperville Illinois 60565 / US | 05 /
KALEY, Christopher, D. 2957 White Thorn Circle Naperville Illinois 60564 / US | 06 /
SCHERTZER, Bryan, M. 2517 Prairie Court Geneva Illinois 60134 / US | [2011/47] |
Former [2011/34] | 01 /
GRIGORIEV, Vladimir, A. 849 West Monroe St. Unit 5PH Chicago Illinois 60607 / US | ||
02 /
FURMAN, Gary, S. 108 South 12th Street St. Charles Illinois 60174 / US | |||
03 /
WEI, Mingli 2016 Chang Court Naperville Illinois 60540 / US | |||
04 /
SU, Winston 338 Meadow Green Drive Naperville Illinois 60565 / US | |||
05 /
KALEY, Christopher, D. 2957 White Thorn Circle Naperville Illinois 60564 / US | |||
06 /
SCHERTZER, Bryan, M. 2517 Prairie Court Geneva Illinois 60134 / US | Representative(s) | HGF Delta House 50 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | HGF Limited Delta House 50 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | ||
Former [2013/14] | Harrison Goddard Foote Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York Yorkshire YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2013/11] | Polypatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | ||
Former [2011/34] | Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York YO1 6JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 09756907.3 | 18.11.2009 | [2011/34] | WO2009US64954 | Priority number, date | US20080273217 | 18.11.2008 Original published format: US 273217 | [2011/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010059699 | Date: | 27.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2358836 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2358836 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C09J179/08, C08G73/02, C08L79/02, C09J179/02, D21H21/14 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
D21H21/146 (EP,US);
C08G73/028 (EP,US);
C08G73/0286 (EP,US);
C08L79/02 (EP,US);
C09J179/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] |
Former [2011/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KREPPKLEBER MIT VERBESSERTEN FILMEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2011/34] | English: | CREPING ADHESIVES WITH IMPROVED FILM PROPERTIES | [2011/34] | French: | ADHÉSIFS DE CRÊPAGE PRÉSENTANT DES PROPRIÉTÉS DE FILM AMÉLIORÉES | [2011/34] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 06.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.11.2009 | AT | 04.10.2017 | CY | 04.10.2017 | CZ | 04.10.2017 | DK | 04.10.2017 | EE | 04.10.2017 | FI | 04.10.2017 | HR | 04.10.2017 | LT | 04.10.2017 | LV | 04.10.2017 | MC | 04.10.2017 | MK | 04.10.2017 | NL | 04.10.2017 | PT | 04.10.2017 | RO | 04.10.2017 | SE | 04.10.2017 | SI | 04.10.2017 | SK | 04.10.2017 | SM | 04.10.2017 | IE | 18.11.2017 | LU | 18.11.2017 | MT | 18.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | FR | 04.12.2017 | BG | 04.01.2018 | NO | 04.01.2018 | GR | 05.01.2018 | IS | 04.02.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 18.11.2009 | |
AT | 04.10.2017 | ||
CY | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MK | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 18.11.2017 | ||
LU | 18.11.2017 | ||
MT | 18.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 04.12.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 18.11.2009 | |
AT | 04.10.2017 | ||
CY | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 18.11.2017 | ||
LU | 18.11.2017 | ||
MT | 18.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 04.12.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.11.2009 | |
AT | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 18.11.2017 | ||
LU | 18.11.2017 | ||
MT | 18.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 04.12.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 18.11.2017 | ||
LU | 18.11.2017 | ||
MT | 18.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 04.12.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 18.11.2017 | ||
LU | 18.11.2017 | ||
MT | 18.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 04.12.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 18.11.2017 | ||
LU | 18.11.2017 | ||
MT | 18.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 18.11.2017 | ||
MT | 18.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 18.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 18.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 04.10.2017 | |
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 04.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005098130 (NALCO CO [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * example -; claims 1,3 *; | [A]US2008257507 (CAMPBELL CLAYTON J [US]) [A] 1-18 * claims 1,9 *; | [AD]US6277242 (ARCHER SAMMY L [US], et al) [AD] 1-18 * example -; claim - * |