EP2297539 - PLATE COOLER FOR FLUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALPVER Vermögens- und Liegen- schaftsverwaltungs GmbH Leopold Steiner-Gasse 12 1190 Wien / AT | For all designated states Euler-Rolle, Thomas Reisnerstrasse 34/3 1030 Wien / AT | [2019/29] |
Former [2015/21] | For all designated states ALPVER Vermögens- und Liegen- schaftsverwaltungs GmbH Leopold Steiner-Gasse 12 1190 Wien / AT | ||
For all designated states Euler-Rolle, Thomas Reisnerstra e 34/3 1030 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states Pustelnik, Philipp Nottebohmstra e 60/3 1190 Wien / AT | ||
For all designated states Euler-Rolle, Thomas Reisnerstra e 34/3 1030 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PUSTELNIK, Philipp Nottebohmstrasse 60/3 1190 Wien / AT | 02 /
EULER-ROLLE, Thomas Reisnerstrasse 34/3 1030 Wien / AT | [2019/13] |
Former [2015/21] | 01 /
PUSTELNIK, Philipp Nottebohmstrasse 60/3 1190 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2011/12] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Fox, Tobias Patentanwälte Schütz u. Partner Brigittenauer Lände 50 1200 Wien / AT | [2019/29] |
Former [2011/12] | Holzer, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Schütz u. Partner Brigittenauer Lände 50 1200 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 09756943.8 | 15.05.2009 | [2011/12] | WO2009AT00201 | Priority number, date | AT20080000891 | 03.06.2008 Original published format: AT 8912008 | [2011/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009146474 | Date: | 10.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2297539 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2297539 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/02, F28F1/16, F28D1/053 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
F28D1/05366 (EP,US);
F28F21/084 (EP,US);
F28F9/002 (EP,US);
F28F9/02 (EP,US);
F28F9/0246 (EP,US);
F28D2021/0049 (EP,US);
F28F2009/0292 (EP,US);
F28F2250/06 (EP,US);
F28F2255/16 (EP,US);
F28F27/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/29] |
Former [2011/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PLATTENKÜHLER FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2011/12] | English: | PLATE COOLER FOR FLUIDS | [2011/12] | French: | REFROIDISSEUR À PLAQUES POUR LIQUIDES | [2011/12] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 17.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2009 | CY | 17.07.2019 | CZ | 17.07.2019 | DK | 17.07.2019 | EE | 17.07.2019 | ES | 17.07.2019 | FI | 17.07.2019 | HR | 17.07.2019 | LT | 17.07.2019 | LV | 17.07.2019 | MC | 17.07.2019 | MK | 17.07.2019 | MT | 17.07.2019 | NL | 17.07.2019 | PL | 17.07.2019 | SI | 17.07.2019 | SK | 17.07.2019 | BG | 17.10.2019 | NO | 17.10.2019 | GR | 18.10.2019 | IS | 17.11.2019 | PT | 18.11.2019 | AT | 15.05.2020 | GB | 15.05.2020 | IE | 15.05.2020 | LU | 15.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 15.05.2009 | |
CY | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
MT | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
AT | 15.05.2020 | ||
GB | 15.05.2020 | ||
IE | 15.05.2020 | ||
LU | 15.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 17.07.2019 | |
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
AT | 15.05.2020 | ||
GB | 15.05.2020 | ||
IE | 15.05.2020 | ||
LU | 15.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | CZ | 17.07.2019 | |
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
GB | 15.05.2020 | ||
IE | 15.05.2020 | ||
LU | 15.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 17.07.2019 | |
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
GB | 15.05.2020 | ||
IE | 15.05.2020 | ||
LU | 15.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | CZ | 17.07.2019 | |
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IE | 15.05.2020 | ||
LU | 15.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | CZ | 17.07.2019 | |
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
LU | 15.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | CZ | 17.07.2019 | |
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 17.07.2019 | |
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 17.07.2019 | |
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | CZ | 17.07.2019 | |
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | DK | 17.07.2019 | |
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | DK | 17.07.2019 | |
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 17.07.2019 | |
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 17.07.2019 | |
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 17.07.2019 | |
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 17.07.2019 | |
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 17.07.2019 | |
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 17.07.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2006081363 (CHISSUS LISA L [US]) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-8 *; | [YD]AT402235B (PUSTELNIK WERNER DIPL ING [AT]) [YD] 1 * page 2, line 34; figure 51 *; | [A]DE2624879 (CHAUSSON USINES SA) [A] 1-2 * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2049149 (IMI MARSTON RADIATORS LTD) [A] 1,3 * page 2, line 90 - line 104; figure 3 *; | [AD]AT414042B (PUSTELNIK PHILIPP DIPL ING [AT], et al) [AD] 1,4 * page 2, line 55 - page 3, line 4; figure 2 *; | [A]WO2005045342 (EULER-ROLLE THOMAS [AT], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 2, line 16 - page 3, line 4; figures 1-5b *; | [A]WO2006083447 (CARRIER CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0041]; figures 12,13 *; | [A]GB1551106 (JOHNSON L, et al) [A] 1-5 * page 4, line 28 - line 58; figures 1-4 * | Examination | US2003085030 | FR1551137 | by applicant | AT414042B | US2006081363 | AT402235B |