EP2316594 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING AND CONTROLLING THE SLAG IN MOLTEN STEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ramon Science and Technology Co., Ltd. No. 21, Furong Road Zhengxiang District Hengyang, Hunan 421001 / CN | [2012/40] |
Former [2011/18] | For all designated states Tian, Zhiheng No. 21 Furong Road, Zhengxiang Dist., Hengyang Hunan 421001 / CN | ||
For all designated states Tian, Lu No. 21 Furong Road Zhengxiang District Hengyang Hunan 421001 / CN | |||
For all designated states Tian, Li No. 21 Furong Road Zhengxiang District Hengyang Hunan 421001 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIAN, Zhiheng No. 21 Furong Road Zhengxiang District Hengyang Hunan 421001 / HK | [2011/18] | Representative(s) | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09757099.8 | 10.07.2009 | [2011/18] | WO2009CN72728 | Priority number, date | CN200810108594 | 02.06.2008 Original published format: CN200810108594 | [2011/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009146665 | Date: | 10.12.2009 | Language: | ZH | [2009/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2316594 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B22D43/00, B22D11/10, B22D46/00 | [2011/18] | CPC: |
B22D11/181 (EP);
B22D2/001 (EP);
B22D2/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/18] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERFASSEN UND STEUERN DER SCHLACKE IN STAHLSCHMELZE | [2011/18] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING AND CONTROLLING THE SLAG IN MOLTEN STEEL | [2011/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ SERVANT À DÉTECTER ET À CONTRÔLER LES SCORIES DANS DE L'ACIER EN FUSION | [2011/18] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2010 | Translation filed | 30.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 30.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 21.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5360051 (TAKAHASHI MAKOTO [JP], et al); | [Y]JPH0890215 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [Y]JPH09262661 (NIPPON KOKAN KK); | [Y]CN1507971 (BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL [CN]); | [XP]CN101306466 (ZHIHENG TIAN [CN]) |