EP2285710 - SPRAYHEAD AND DISPENSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptar Milano S.r.l. S.S. dei Giovi 35, n.1/b Zibido San Giacomo (MI) / IT | [2011/19] |
Former [2011/08] | For all designated states Somova Srl. Strada Statale 35 Dei Giovi 1/b 20080 Zibido S. Giacomio (MI) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARZIO, Pepe Via Vigevano 9 I-20144 Milano / IT | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2011/08] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09757288.7 | 04.06.2009 | [2011/08] | WO2009EP03978 | Priority number, date | EP20080010156 | 04.06.2008 Original published format: EP 08010156 | EP20080011820 | 30.06.2008 Original published format: EP 08011820 | [2011/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009146905 | Date: | 10.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2285710 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/16 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
B65D83/222 (EP,US);
B05B11/0032 (EP,US);
B05B11/1059 (EP,US);
B65D83/206 (EP,US);
B65D83/40 (EP,US);
B65D83/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/08] | Title | German: | SPRÜHKOPF UND AUSGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2011/08] | English: | SPRAYHEAD AND DISPENSING DEVICE | [2011/08] | French: | TÊTE DE PULVÉRISATION ET DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION | [2011/08] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 03.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 27.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.02.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 07.02.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.02.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR1503545 (MELOCCHI MARIO [IT]) [X] 1-8,10-14,16,17,21-24,26-31 * pages 3-4; figures 6-12 * [Y] 17-20; | GB1179304 [ ] (MELOCCHI MARIO [IT]) [ ] * page 3, lines 49-101; figures 8,9 *; | [X]JPS63117783U (UNKNOWN) [X] 1-5,8,11-14,16,21-24,26-31 * figure - *; | [X]JPS63126061U (UNKNOWN) [X] 1-8,10-13,21,24,26-31 * figure - *; | [X]WO0153157 (SEAQUIST PERFECT DISPENSING [DE], et al) [X] 1-13,15,16,21,24-31 * page 12, lines 4-16; figure - *; | [Y]JP2002284261 (MITANI VALVE CO LTD) [Y] 17-20 * abstract *; | [ID]US2004222245 (MARRONCLES ALAIN [FR]) [ID] 1-15,23,24,28-31 * paragraphs [0031] - [0037]; figure - *; | [I]US2006097014 (VON SCHUCKMANN ALFRED [DE]) [I] 1-15,21-31 * paragraphs [0026] , [0029] , [0045] *; | [I]WO2006066363 (ACRUX DDS PTY LTD [AU], et al) [I] 1-6,8-16,21,23,25,30,31* page 7, line 1 - page 10, line 11; figures 1-13 * | Examination | US3107670 | WO2007022422 |