EP2310349 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF HALOGENATED BENZOIC ACID DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACHMANN, Stephan In den duerren Matten 1 CH-4123 Allschwil / CH | 02 /
HILDBRAND, Stefan Loerenweg 7 CH-4460 Gelterkinden / CH | 03 /
JAPPY, James Lillehammer 2 The Mead Ashtead Surry KT21 2LZ / GB | 04 /
PATEL, Dinesh Maganbhai 19 Bannister Close Langley Slough Berkshire SL3 7DP / GB | 05 /
PFLEGER, Christophe 22 rue George Sand F-68200 Mulhouse / FR | 06 /
TIDSWELL, Robert John Ernest 28 Temple Road Epsom Surry KT19 8 HA / GB | 07 /
TRUSSARDI, Rene Salinenstrasse 2a CH-4127 Birsfelden / CH | [2013/17] |
Former [2011/16] | 01 /
BACHMANN, Stephan In den duerren Matten 1 CH-4123 Allschwil / CH | ||
02 /
HILDBRAND, Stefan Loerenweg 7 CH-4460 Gelterkinden / CH | |||
03 /
JAPPY, James Lillehammer 2 The Mead Ashtead Surry KT21 2LZ / GB | |||
04 /
PATEL, Dinesh Maganbhai 19 Bannister Close Langley Slough Berkshire SL3 7DP / GB | |||
05 /
PFLEGER, Christophe 22 rue George Sand F-68200 Mulhouse / FR | |||
06 /
TIDSWELL, Robert John Ernest 28 Temple Road Epsom Surry KT19 8 HA / GB | |||
07 /
TRUSSARDI, Rene Salinenstrasse 2a CH-4127 Birsfelden / CH | Representative(s) | Rauber, Beat F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department 675 / 3. OG Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel 2 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Rauber, Beat F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department 675 / 3. OG Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel 2 / CH | ||
Former [2011/16] | Rauber, Beat F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department 675 / 3. OG Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel 2 / CH | Application number, filing date | 09757450.3 | 28.05.2009 | [2011/16] | WO2009EP56560 | Priority number, date | EP20080157757 | 06.06.2008 Original published format: EP 08157757 | [2011/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009147068 | Date: | 10.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2310349 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2310349 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/00, C07C51/15, C07C51/285, C07C51/29, C07C63/70, C07C47/55, C07C45/51 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
C07C45/518 (EP,US);
C07C45/00 (EP,US);
C07C51/15 (EP,US);
C07C51/285 (EP,US);
C07C51/29 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/00, C07C47/55 (EP,US);
C07C45/518, C07C47/55 (US,EP);
C07C51/15, C07C63/70 (US,EP);
C07C51/285, C07C63/70 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG HALOGENIERTER BENZOESÄUREDERIVATE | [2011/16] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF HALOGENATED BENZOIC ACID DERIVATIVES | [2011/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION DE DÉRIVÉS HALOGÉNÉS DE L'ACIDE BENZOÏQUE | [2011/16] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 08.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.05.2009 | AT | 24.04.2013 | BE | 24.04.2013 | CY | 24.04.2013 | CZ | 24.04.2013 | DK | 24.04.2013 | EE | 24.04.2013 | FI | 24.04.2013 | HR | 24.04.2013 | LT | 24.04.2013 | LV | 24.04.2013 | MC | 24.04.2013 | MK | 24.04.2013 | MT | 24.04.2013 | NL | 24.04.2013 | PL | 24.04.2013 | RO | 24.04.2013 | SE | 24.04.2013 | SI | 24.04.2013 | SK | 24.04.2013 | IE | 28.05.2013 | LU | 28.05.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | NO | 24.07.2013 | GR | 25.07.2013 | IS | 24.08.2013 | PT | 26.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
MK | 24.04.2013 | ||
MT | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
IE | 28.05.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
MT | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
IE | 28.05.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
IE | 28.05.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 24.04.2013 | |
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE3935934 (OCCIDENTAL CHEM CO [US]) [DA] 1 * example 1 * | by applicant | DE3935934 |