EP2285879 - IMPROVED CONDUCTIVITY OF RESIN MATERIALS AND COMPOSITE MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hexcel Composites Limited Ickleton Road Duxford Cambridgeshire CB22 4QB / GB | [2017/26] |
Former [2011/08] | For all designated states Hexcel Composites Limited Duxford Cambridge CB2 4QD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAWSE, John, Leslie 4 Viking Close West Wratting Cambridgeshire CB21 5NH / GB | 02 /
SIMMONS, Martin 71 Minerva Way Cambridgeshire CB4 2TY / GB | [2017/30] |
Former [2011/08] | 01 /
CAWSE, John, Leslie 4 Viking Close West Wratting Cambridgeshire CB21 5NH / GB | ||
02 /
SIMMONS, Martin 71 Minerva Way Cambridgeshire CB4 2TY / GB | Representative(s) | Eddowes, Simon, et al Hexcel Composites Limited Ickleton Road Duxford, Cambridgeshire CB22 4QB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | Eddowes, Simon, et al Hexcel Composites Limited Ickleton Road Duxford, Cambridge CB22 4QB / GB | ||
Former [2011/08] | Willett, Christopher David, et al Nash Matthews 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 09757787.8 | 05.06.2009 | [2011/08] | WO2009GB01437 | Priority number, date | GB20080010453 | 07.06.2008 Original published format: GB 0810453 | [2011/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009147415 | Date: | 10.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2285879 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2285879 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/04, H01B1/20 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
H01B1/24 (EP,US);
C08K3/04 (GB);
C08G59/5033 (EP,US);
C08K3/046 (EP,US);
C08K7/06 (EP,US);
C08L33/00 (GB);
C08L33/12 (EP,GB,US);
C08L53/005 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (EP,US);
C08L81/06 (EP,US);
C08G59/02 (EP,US);
C08J5/249 (EP,GB,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08K3/046, C08L33/12, C08L53/005 (EP,US);
C08L63/00, C08K3/046, C08L81/06 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/30] |
Former [2011/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE LEITFÄHIGKEIT VON HARZMATERIALIEN UND VERBUNDWERKSTOFFEN | [2011/08] | English: | IMPROVED CONDUCTIVITY OF RESIN MATERIALS AND COMPOSITE MATERIALS | [2011/08] | French: | CONDUCTIVITÉ AMÉLIORÉE DE MATÉRIAUX EN RÉSINE ET DE MATÉRIAUX COMPOSITES | [2011/08] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 09.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/27] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.08.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 22.08.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.09.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.06.2009 | AT | 26.07.2017 | CY | 26.07.2017 | CZ | 26.07.2017 | DK | 26.07.2017 | EE | 26.07.2017 | FI | 26.07.2017 | HR | 26.07.2017 | LT | 26.07.2017 | LV | 26.07.2017 | MC | 26.07.2017 | MK | 26.07.2017 | NL | 26.07.2017 | PL | 26.07.2017 | PT | 26.07.2017 | RO | 26.07.2017 | SE | 26.07.2017 | SI | 26.07.2017 | SK | 26.07.2017 | TR | 26.07.2017 | BG | 26.10.2017 | NO | 26.10.2017 | GR | 27.10.2017 | IS | 26.11.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 05.06.2009 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PT | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 26.07.2017 | |
NO | 26.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0049076 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US], et al); | [A]US2002183438 (AMARASEKERA JAYANTHA [US], et al); | by applicant | US2002183438 |