EP2300141 - SYSTEM FOR EXTERNALLY HOLDING A CATALYST BED IN A RADIAL FLOW REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/13] | SYSTEM FOR EXTERNALLY HOLDING A CATALYST BED IN RADIAL FLOW REACTOR | ||
[2012/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUROSLOT KDSS France Usine Relais Des Priedons Sud 86140 Scorbe Clairvaux / FR | [2011/50] |
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states Euroslot ZA les Priédons 86140 Scorbe Clairvaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NADERI, Abdol Hossein 26 route de Nouaillé 86000 Poitiers / FR | [2011/13] | Representative(s) | Thibon-Littaye, Annick Cabinet THIBON-LITTAYE BP 19 78164 Marly-le-Roi Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | Thibon-Littaye, Annick Cabinet THIBON-LITTAYE BP 19 78164 Marly-le-Roi / FR | ||
Former [2011/13] | Thibon-Littaye, Annick Cabinet THIBON-LITTAYE BP 19 78164 Marly-le-Roi / FR | Application number, filing date | 09757857.9 | 02.06.2009 | [2011/13] | WO2009IB05819 | Priority number, date | FR20080003007 | 02.06.2008 Original published format: FR 0803007 | [2011/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009147503 | Date: | 10.12.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2300141 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2300141 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/02 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
B01J8/0085 (EP,US);
B01J8/0214 (EP,US);
B01J8/0278 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00814 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM EXTERNEN HALTEN EINER KATALYSATORSCHÜTTUNG IN EINEM RADIALSTROMREAKTOR | [2011/13] | English: | SYSTEM FOR EXTERNALLY HOLDING A CATALYST BED IN A RADIAL FLOW REACTOR | [2012/30] | French: | SYSTEME DE RETENTION EXTERNE D'UN LIT DE CATALYSEUR DANS UN REACTEUR A FLUX RADIAL | [2011/13] |
Former [2011/13] | SYSTEM FOR EXTERNALLY HOLDING A CATALYST BED IN RADIAL FLOW REACTOR | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 19.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.06.2009 | AT | 01.08.2012 | CY | 01.08.2012 | CZ | 01.08.2012 | DK | 01.08.2012 | EE | 01.08.2012 | FI | 01.08.2012 | HR | 01.08.2012 | LT | 01.08.2012 | LV | 01.08.2012 | MC | 01.08.2012 | MK | 01.08.2012 | MT | 01.08.2012 | NL | 01.08.2012 | PL | 01.08.2012 | RO | 01.08.2012 | SE | 01.08.2012 | SI | 01.08.2012 | SK | 01.08.2012 | TR | 01.08.2012 | BG | 01.11.2012 | NO | 01.11.2012 | GR | 02.11.2012 | ES | 12.11.2012 | IS | 01.12.2012 | PT | 03.12.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
MC | 01.08.2012 | ||
MK | 01.08.2012 | ||
MT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
TR | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
MC | 01.08.2012 | ||
MT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
MC | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 01.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0483975 (NAGAOKA KK [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US6224838 (SCHULZ GARY A [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract ** column 9, line 50 - line 60; figure 6 *; | [DA]WO0166239 (UNITED STATES FILTER CORP [US], et al) [DA] 1-12 * abstract * * page 8, line 22 - line 30; figure 7 * * page 9, line 29 - page 10, line 21; figure 9 * |