EP2293756 - EVACUATION MATTRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kenaltly, Christopher 41 Whitney Avenue Toronto, Ontario M4W2A7 / CA | [2011/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KENALTY, Christopher 41 Whitney Avenue Toronto, Ontario M4W 2A7 / CA | 02 /
GORDON, Miriam 1249 Mississauge Road Mississauga, Ontario L5H 2J1 / CA | [2011/30] |
Former [2011/11] | 01 /
KENALTY, Christopher 41 Whitney Avenue Toronto, Ontario M4W 2A7 / CA | ||
02 /
GORDON, Miriam 105 Cottingham Street Toronto, Ontario M4V 1B9 / CA | Representative(s) | Johnson, Richard Alan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/13] | Johnson, Richard Alan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2011/11] | Johnson, Richard Alan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09757889.2 | 05.06.2009 | [2011/11] | WO2009IB06323 | Priority number, date | US20080134432 | 06.06.2008 Original published format: US 134432 | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009147536 | Date: | 10.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2293756 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2293756 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 28.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/05, A61G1/01, A61G1/02 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
A61G7/0504 (EP,US);
A61G1/01 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/11] | Title | German: | EVAKUIERUNGSMATRATZE | [2011/11] | English: | EVACUATION MATTRESS | [2011/11] | French: | MATELAS D'ÉVACUATION | [2011/11] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 09.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.06.2009 | AT | 26.03.2014 | BE | 26.03.2014 | CY | 26.03.2014 | CZ | 26.03.2014 | DK | 26.03.2014 | EE | 26.03.2014 | ES | 26.03.2014 | FI | 26.03.2014 | HR | 26.03.2014 | IT | 26.03.2014 | LT | 26.03.2014 | LV | 26.03.2014 | MC | 26.03.2014 | MK | 26.03.2014 | MT | 26.03.2014 | NL | 26.03.2014 | PL | 26.03.2014 | RO | 26.03.2014 | SE | 26.03.2014 | SI | 26.03.2014 | SK | 26.03.2014 | TR | 26.03.2014 | IE | 05.06.2014 | LU | 05.06.2014 | BG | 26.06.2014 | NO | 26.06.2014 | GR | 27.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | FR | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | IS | 26.07.2014 | PT | 28.07.2014 | DE | 01.01.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 05.06.2009 | |
AT | 26.03.2014 | ||
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
TR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
DE | 01.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 05.06.2009 | |
AT | 26.03.2014 | ||
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
DE | 01.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
DE | 01.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
DE | 01.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
DE | 01.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
DE | 01.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
DE | 01.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
LU | 05.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
LU | 05.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
LU | 05.06.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 26.03.2014 | |
NO | 26.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO8607253 (NEER INTERNATIONAL B V V D [NL]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 24 - page 5, line 12; figure 4 * [I] 2; | [XI]EP0371525 (BOULANGER CLAUDE) [X] 1 * column 4, line 2 - line 49; figures 4-6 * [I] 2; | [XD]US5249321 (GRAF JORG W [CA]) [XD] 1,3-8,10-15* the whole document *; | [X]US2007180625 (WALKE JAMES L [US], et al) [X] 1,7,9-13 * paragraph [0028]; figures 1-4 * | International search | [A]EP0165043 (BROOKS DAVID ANTHONY); | [A]GB2182570 (WISE VICTOR LEONARD); | [A]US5050254 (MURPHY WENDY J [CA]); | [X]US5249321 (GRAF JORG W [CA]) | by applicant | US2007180625 |