EP2287657 - DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATOH, Hiromi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 02 /
Brown, Christopher c/o Sharp Laboratiries of Europe Limited Edmund Halley Road Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GB United Kingdom / JP | [2011/13] |
Former [2011/08] | 01 /
KATOH, Hiormi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | ||
02 /
Brown, Christopher c/o Sharp Laboratiries of Europe Limited Edmund Halley Road Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GB United Kingdom / JP | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09758259.7 | 28.05.2009 | [2011/08] | WO2009JP59769 | Priority number, date | JP20080146072 | 03.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008146072 | [2011/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009147992 | Date: | 10.12.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2287657 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/133, G02F1/1335, G02F1/1368, G09F9/30, H01L31/10, G06F3/041, G06F3/042 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
G06F3/0412 (EP,US);
G06F3/042 (EP,US);
G02F1/13312 (EP,US);
G02F1/13338 (EP,US);
H01L31/101 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/08] | G02F1/133, G02F1/1335, G02F1/1368, G09F9/30, H01L31/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/08] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2011/08] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE | [2011/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2011/08] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2010 | Translation filed | 24.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 14.11.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006033016 (OGAWA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0068] * [I] 3,5,6; | [XI]JP2007304245 (SONY CORP) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0057]; figure 3 * [I] 2-5; | [XI]US2008122792 (IZADI SHAHRAM [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0060] * [I] 4; | [A]US2007070056 (SATO HIDEO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0120]; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0509589 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 5 * paragraph [0019] *; | [A]GB2439118 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007268206 (KINOSHITA MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0065] * | International search | [X]JP2007304245 (SONY CORP); | [X]JP2006079589 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]JPH0611690 (ROHM CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2006003857 | WO2007145346 | WO2007145347 | - T. NAKAMURA ET AL., "A Touch Panel Function Integrated LCD Including LTPS A/D Converter", SID 05 DIGEST, (2005), pages 1,054 - 1,055 |