EP2295479 - COPOLYMER, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, OIL REPELLENT COMPOSITION AND ARTICLE PROCESSED WITH THE OIL REPELLENT COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited Shin-Marunouchi Building 1-5-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSHINO, Taiki c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2015/07] |
Former [2011/11] | 01 /
HOSHINO, Taiki c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2015/07] |
Former [2011/11] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 DE-81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09758296.9 | 01.06.2009 | [2011/11] | WO2009JP60010 | Priority number, date | JP20080145056 | 02.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008145056 | [2011/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009148029 | Date: | 10.12.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2295479 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2295479 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/24, C08F220/18, C09D133/16, C09K3/00, C09K3/18 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
C09D133/066 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/24 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/18 (KR);
C08F220/1806 (EP,US);
C08F220/1808 (EP,US);
C08F220/26 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F220/24, C08F220/1806, C08F220/281, C08F220/343 (EP,US);
C08F220/24, C08F220/1808, C08F220/281, C08F220/343 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/11] | Title | German: | COPOLYMER, VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG SOWIE ÖLABWEISENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND MIT DER ÖLABWEISENDEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNG BEARBEITETER ARTIKEL | [2011/11] | English: | COPOLYMER, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, OIL REPELLENT COMPOSITION AND ARTICLE PROCESSED WITH THE OIL REPELLENT COMPOSITION | [2011/11] | French: | COPOLYMÈRE, PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE CELUI-CI, COMPOSITION OLÉOFUGE ET ARTICLE TRAITÉ AVEC LA COMPOSITION OLÉOFUGE | [2011/11] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2010 | Translation filed | 02.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 13.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.06.2009 | AT | 11.02.2015 | BE | 11.02.2015 | BG | 11.02.2015 | CY | 11.02.2015 | CZ | 11.02.2015 | DK | 11.02.2015 | EE | 11.02.2015 | ES | 11.02.2015 | FI | 11.02.2015 | HR | 11.02.2015 | LT | 11.02.2015 | LV | 11.02.2015 | MC | 11.02.2015 | MK | 11.02.2015 | MT | 11.02.2015 | NL | 11.02.2015 | PL | 11.02.2015 | PT | 11.02.2015 | RO | 11.02.2015 | SE | 11.02.2015 | SI | 11.02.2015 | SK | 11.02.2015 | TR | 11.02.2015 | NO | 11.05.2015 | GR | 12.05.2015 | GB | 01.06.2015 | IE | 01.06.2015 | LU | 01.06.2015 | IS | 11.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 01.06.2009 | |
AT | 11.02.2015 | ||
BE | 11.02.2015 | ||
BG | 11.02.2015 | ||
CY | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
MK | 11.02.2015 | ||
MT | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
TR | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
GB | 01.06.2015 | ||
IE | 01.06.2015 | ||
LU | 01.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 01.06.2009 | |
AT | 11.02.2015 | ||
BE | 11.02.2015 | ||
BG | 11.02.2015 | ||
CY | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
MT | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
TR | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
GB | 01.06.2015 | ||
IE | 01.06.2015 | ||
LU | 01.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
BE | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
MT | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
GB | 01.06.2015 | ||
IE | 01.06.2015 | ||
LU | 01.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
BE | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
GB | 01.06.2015 | ||
IE | 01.06.2015 | ||
LU | 01.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
GB | 01.06.2015 | ||
IE | 01.06.2015 | ||
LU | 01.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IE | 01.06.2015 | ||
LU | 01.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IE | 01.06.2015 | ||
LU | 01.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
LU | 01.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
ES | 11.02.2015 | ||
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 11.02.2015 | |
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 11.02.2015 | |
FI | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
SE | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 11.02.2015 | |
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 11.02.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO02083809 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [I] 1-11* paragraph [0070]; examples 11, 12 * | International search | [Y]JPH07188339 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [A]JP2002256130 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [X]WO02083809 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2004035708 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2006022122 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al); | [AP]WO2008153075 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | WO02083809 | WO2004035708 | JP2007333564 | JP2008145056 |