EP2298176 - MEDICAL IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING MEDICAL IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Medical Corporation 4-14-1, Sotokanda Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHONO, Tomoaki c/o HITACHI MEDICAL CORPORATION 4-14-1 Soto-kanda Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2011/12] | Application number, filing date | 09758308.2 | 02.06.2009 | [2011/12] | WO2009JP60043 | Priority number, date | JP20080145456 | 03.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008145456 | [2011/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009148041 | Date: | 10.12.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2298176 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08, A61B6/00 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
G06T7/20 (EP,US);
A61B6/5217 (EP,US);
A61B6/5235 (EP,US);
A61B8/5238 (EP,US);
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G16H50/30 (EP);
A61B8/08 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10132 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20081 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30048 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/12] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG MEDIZINISCHER BILDER UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG MEDIZINISCHER BILDER | [2011/12] | English: | MEDICAL IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING MEDICAL IMAGE | [2011/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE MÉDICALE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE MÉDICALE | [2011/12] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2010 | Translation filed | 27.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 27.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 13.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/22] | 27.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2001024516 (YOSHIOKA HIDEKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,9-12 * paragraphs [0011] , [0013] - [0017] - [0020] , [0033] - [0034] - [0038] - [0048] - [0122] , [0125] - [0152] - [0157] , [0270] , [0279]; figure -; claim - * * paragraphs [0280] - [0289] - [0301] , [0324] - [0329] * [Y] 8 [I] 4,6; | [YA]WO2005096226 (SIEMENS MEDICAL SOLUTIONS [US], et al) [Y] 8 * page 1, lines 1-12 * * page 2, line 5 - page 5, line 3 * * page 6, line 1 - page 10, line 18; figure -; claim - * [A] 1-7,9-12; | [XAY]EP1665987 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,7,9,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] - [0024]; figure -; claim - * [A] 3,4,6,11,12[Y] 8 | International search | [Y]JPS58180138 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP); | [A]JP2004313291 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2006110190 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [X]JP2007530160 (SIEMENS MEDICAL SOLUTIONS USA, INC.) | by applicant | JP2002140689 |