EP2302050 - METHOD FOR ASSESSING EMBRYOTOXICITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/13] | METHOD FOR EVALUATION OF DEVELOPMENTAL TOXICITY | ||
[2016/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2011/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Noriyuki c/o SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED 1-98 Kasugadenaka 3-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-8558 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Koichi c/o SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED 1-98 Kasugadenaka 3-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-8558 / JP | 03 /
ANDO, Satoshi c/o SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED 1-98 Kasugadenaka 3-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-8558 / JP | 04 /
HORIE, Nobuyuki c/o SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED 1-98 Kasugadenaka 3-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-8558 / JP | [2018/16] |
Former [2012/35] | 01 /
SUZUKI, Noriyuki 2-27-401 Shimoyoshihara-cho Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 662-0956 / JP | ||
02 /
SAITO, Koichi 4-3-20-405, Nakanoshima Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | |||
03 /
ANDO, Satoshi 2-10-2-233 Sonehigashino-cho Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-0802 / JP | |||
04 /
HORIE, Nobuyuki 14-11 Koshien6ban-cho Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 663-8176 / JP | |||
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
SUZUKI, Noriyuki 2-27-401 Shimoyoshihara-cho Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 662-0956 / JP | ||
02 /
SAITO, Koichi 4-3-20-405, Nakanoshima, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | |||
03 /
ANDO, Satoshi 2-10-2-233 Sonehigashino-cho Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-0802 / JP | |||
04 /
HORIE, Nobuyuki 14-11 Koshien6ban-cho Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 663-8176 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/16] |
Former [2011/13] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09758444.5 | 02.06.2009 | [2011/13] | WO2009JP60410 | Priority number, date | JP20080145433 | 03.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008145433 | [2011/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009148177 | Date: | 10.12.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2302050 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2302050 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, A01K67/027, C12N5/10, C12Q1/02, C12Q1/68 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12N5/0603 (US);
C12Q1/6809 (EP,US);
G01N33/5014 (EP,US);
A01K2217/052 (EP,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6809, C12Q2545/113 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/16] |
Former [2011/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEWERTUNG VON EMBRYOTOXIZITÄT | [2017/45] | English: | METHOD FOR ASSESSING EMBRYOTOXICITY | [2017/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION D'EMBRYOTOXICITÉ | [2017/45] |
Former [2011/13] | VERFAHREN ZUR BEWERTUNG ENTWICKLUNGSBIOLOGISCHER TOXIZITÄT | ||
Former [2011/13] | METHOD FOR EVALUATION OF DEVELOPMENTAL TOXICITY | ||
Former [2011/13] | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION DE LA TOXICITÉ LIÉE AU DÉVELOPPEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2010 | Translation filed | 28.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 29.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 08.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 14.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17180299.4 / EP3296396 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.11.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 08.11.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.11.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.06.2009 | AT | 18.04.2018 | CY | 18.04.2018 | CZ | 18.04.2018 | DK | 18.04.2018 | EE | 18.04.2018 | ES | 18.04.2018 | FI | 18.04.2018 | HR | 18.04.2018 | LT | 18.04.2018 | LV | 18.04.2018 | MC | 18.04.2018 | MK | 18.04.2018 | PL | 18.04.2018 | RO | 18.04.2018 | SE | 18.04.2018 | SI | 18.04.2018 | SK | 18.04.2018 | TR | 18.04.2018 | IE | 02.06.2018 | LU | 02.06.2018 | MT | 02.06.2018 | BG | 18.07.2018 | NO | 18.07.2018 | GR | 19.07.2018 | IS | 18.08.2018 | PT | 20.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 02.06.2009 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CY | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
MK | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 02.06.2018 | ||
LU | 02.06.2018 | ||
MT | 02.06.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 02.06.2009 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 02.06.2018 | ||
LU | 02.06.2018 | ||
MT | 02.06.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 02.06.2018 | ||
LU | 02.06.2018 | ||
MT | 02.06.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 02.06.2018 | ||
LU | 02.06.2018 | ||
MT | 02.06.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 02.06.2018 | ||
LU | 02.06.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 02.06.2018 | ||
LU | 02.06.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
LU | 02.06.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 18.04.2018 | |
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0034525 (VISTAGEN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * claim 1 *; | [A] - MCFADDEN DAVID G ET AL, "The Hand1 and Hand2 transcription factors regulate expansion of the embryonic cardiac ventricles in a gene dosage-dependent manner", DEVELOPMENT, COMPANY OF BIOLOGISTS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (20050101), vol. 132, no. 1, doi:10.1242/DEV.01562, ISSN 0950-1991, pages 189 - 201, XP002463355 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/dev.01562 | [ ] - RININGER J A ET AL, "Differential gene expression technologies for identifying surrogate markers of drug efficacy and toxicity", DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, ELSEVIER, RAHWAY, NJ, US, (20001201), vol. 5, no. 12, doi:10.1016/S1359-6446(00)01597-X, ISSN 1359-6446, pages 560 - 568, XP002249959 [ ] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6446(00)01597-X | [A] - RININGER J A ET AL, "Differential gene expression technologies for identifying surrogate markers of drug efficacy and toxicity", DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, ELSEVIER, RAHWAY, NJ, US, (20001201), vol. 5, no. 12, doi:10.1016/S1359-6446(00)01597-X, ISSN 1359-6446, pages 560 - 568, XP002249959 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6446(00)01597-X | International search | [X] - VASICEK R. ET AL., "Expression of the human Handl gene in trophoblastic cells is transcriptionally regulated by activating and repressing specificity protein (Sp)-elements.", GENE, (2003), vol. 302, pages 115 - 127, XP004402161 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(02)01096-X | [A] - HOLLENBERG S.M. ET AL., "Identification of a new family of tissue-specific basic helix-loop-helix proteins with a two-hybrid system.", MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1995), vol. 15, pages 3813 - 3822, XP008140818 | [A] - CSERJESI P. ET AL., "Expression of the novel basic helix-loop-helix gene eHAND in neural crest derivatives and extraembryonic membranes during mouse development.", DEV. BIOL., (1995), vol. 170, pages 664 - 678, XP008140819 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/dbio.1995.1245 | [A] - KOSAZUMA T. ET AL., "Organ culture of the fetal mouse palate for screening the developmental toxicity of chemicals: a validation study.", CONGENIT. ANOM., (2004), vol. 44, pages 60 - 71, XP008140868 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1741-4520.2004.00010.x | [A] - LASCHINSKI G. ET AL., "Cytotoxicity test using blastocyst-derived euploid embryonal stem cells: a new approach to in vitro teratogenesis screening.", REPROD. TOXICOLOGY, (1991), vol. 5, pages 57 - 64, XP023821169 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0890-6238(91)90111-R | [A] - SEILER A. ET AL., "Improvement of an in vitro stem cell assay for developmental toxicity: the use of molecular endpoints in the embryonic stem cell test.", REPROD. TOXICOL., (2004), vol. 18, pages 231 - 240, XP002493702 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.reprotox.2003.10.015 | [A] - NEMETH K.A. ET AL., "Searching for biomarkers of developmental toxicity with microarrays: normal eye morphogenesis in rodent embryos.", TOXICOL. APPL. PHARMACOL., (2005), vol. 206, pages 219 - 228, XP004964692 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.taap.2004.12.013 | [A] - ADLER S. ET AL., "First steps in establishing a developmental toxicity test method based on human embryonic stem cells.", TOXICOL. IN VITRO, (200802), vol. 22, pages 200 - 211, XP022393683 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tiv.2007.07.013 | Examination | US2006292695 | - ZUR NIEDEN N ET AL, "Molecular markers in embryonic stem cells", TOXICOLOGY IN VITRO, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, vol. 15, no. 4-5, ISSN 0887-2333, (20010801), pages 455 - 461, (20010801), XP027359650 | by applicant | - H. SPIELMANN; I. POHL; B. DORING; M. LIEBSCH; F. MOLDENHAUER, VITRO TOXICOLOGY, (1997), vol. 10, no. 1, pages L19 - 127 | - E. GENSCHOW; H. SPIELMANN; G. SCHOLZ; 1. POHL; A. SEILER; N. CLEMANN; S. BREMER; K. BECKER, ATLA, (2004), vol. 32, pages 209 - 244 | - E. GENSCHOW; H. SPIELMANN; G. SCHOLZ; A. SEILER; N. BROWN; A. PIERSMA; M. BRADY; N. CLEMANN; H. HUUSKONEN; F. PAILLARD, ATLA, (2002), vol. 30, pages L51 - 176 | - TAKAHASHI K; YAMANAKA S, CELL, (2006), vol. 126, no. 4, pages 663 - 676 | - TAKAHASHI K; TANABE K; OHNUKI M; NARITA M; ICHISAKA T; TOMODA K; YAMANAKA S, CELL, (2007), vol. 131, no. 5, pages 861 - 872 | - YU J; VODYANIK MA; SMUGA-OTTO K; ANTOSIEWICZ-BOURGET J; FRANE JL; TIAN S; NIE J; JONSDOTTIR GA; RUOTTI V; STEWART R, SCIENCE, (2007), vol. 318, no. 5858, pages 1917 - 1920 | - NAKAGAWA M; KOYANAGI M; TANABE K; TAKAHASHI K; ICHISAKA T; AOI T; OKITA K; MOCHIDUKI Y; TAKIZAWA N; YAMANAKA S, NAT BIOTECHNOL., (2008), vol. 26, no. 1, pages 101 - 106 | - A. SEILER; A. VISAN; R. BUESEN; E. GENSCHOW; H. SPIELMANN, REPRODUCTIVE TOXICOLOGY, (2004), vol. 18, pages 231 - 240 | - DNA Microarray and Up-to-date PCR Method | - NAT GENET., (200212), vol. 32, no. 526-32 | - SAMBROOK, J; RUSSELL, D.W., Molecular Cloning, vol. 3 |